Summary: H.R.2225 — 96th Congress (1979-1980)All Information (Except Text)

There is one summary for H.R.2225. Bill summaries are authored by CRS.

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/15/1979)

Limits the availability of veterans' job counseling, training, and placement service to only those veterans who served during a period of war, including (1) the period April 28, 1952, through July 1, 1955; and (2) a period of 180 days and part of which occurred after August 4, 1964, and May 7, 1975.