Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Veterans Disability Compensation and Survivors Benefits Amendments of 1979

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Veterans and Survivors Benefits Adjustment Act of 1979

Official Titles

Official Title as Enacted

An act to amend title 38, United States Code, to provide a cost-of-living increase in the rates of compensation paid to veterans with service-connected disabilities and in the rates of dependency and indemnity compensations paid to survivors of veterans, to modify certain veterans' life insurance programs, and to exempt Veterans' Administration home loans from State anti-usury laws; to provide for certain assistance in locating individuals who were exposed to occupational hazards during military service; and for other purposes.

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

A bill to amend title 38, United States Code, to provide a cost-of-living increase in the rates of disability compensation for disabled veterans and in the rates of dependency and indemnity compensation for survivors of disabled veterans.


Actions Overview (10)

Date
11/28/1979Public Law 96-128.
11/28/1979Signed by President.
11/20/1979Measure presented to President.
11/16/1979Resolving differences -- House actions: House agreed to Senate amendment.
11/15/1979Resolving differences -- Senate actions: Senate agreed to House amendment with an amendment.
10/30/1979Resolving differences -- House actions: House agreed to Senate amendments with amendments.
08/03/1979Passed/agreed to in Senate: Measure passed Senate, amended.
07/16/1979Passed/agreed to in House: Measure passed House, amended, roll call #334 (350-0).
06/27/1979Reported to House from the Committee on Veterans' Affairs with amendment, H. Rept. 96-310.
02/21/1979Introduced in House

All Actions (18)

Date Chamber
11/28/1979Public Law 96-128.
11/28/1979Signed by President.
11/20/1979HouseMeasure presented to President.
11/20/1979Measure enrolled in Senate.
11/20/1979Measure enrolled in House.
11/16/1979HouseHouse agreed to Senate amendment.
11/15/1979SenateSenate agreed to House amendment with an amendment.
10/30/1979HouseHouse agreed to Senate amendments with amendments.
08/03/1979SenateMeasure passed Senate, amended.
08/03/1979SenateMeasure considered in Senate.
08/03/1979SenateMeasure called up by unanimous consent in Senate.
07/17/1979SenatePlaced on calendar in Senate.
07/16/1979HouseMeasure passed House, amended, roll call #334 (350-0).
07/16/1979HouseMeasure considered in House.
07/16/1979HouseMeasure called up under motion to suspend rules and pass in House.
06/27/1979HouseReported to House from the Committee on Veterans' Affairs with amendment, H. Rept. 96-310.
02/21/1979HouseReferred to House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
02/21/1979HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs02/21/1979 Referred to
06/27/1979 Reported by H.Rept 96-310

No related bill information was received for H.R.2282.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (5)

There are 5 summaries for H.R.2282. View summaries

Shown Here:
Senate agreed to House amendment with amendment (11/15/1979)

(Senate agreed to House amendment with an amendment)

Veterans Disability Compensation and Survivors' Benefits Amendments of 1979 - =Title I: Veterans' Disability Compensation Benefits= - Increases the rates of veterans' compensation for: (1) wartime disability compensation; (2) additional compensation for dependents; and (3) clothing allowances paid to certain disabled veterans.

Revises certain veteran eligibility requirements for aid-and-attendance allowances. Provides for the establishment of intermediate rates for purposes of service-connected disability benefits.

Authorizes the Administrator of the Veterans' Administration to adjust the rates of disability compensation for certain veterans, consistent with the increases authorized under this title.

=Title II: Survivors' Dependency and Indemnity Compensation Benefits= - Increases the rates of veterans' dependency and indemnity compensation for: (1) a surviving spouse; (2) surviving children; and (3) supplemental children's benefits, beginning October 1, 1979.

=Title III: Amendments to Certain Veterans' Life Insurance Provisions= - Authorizes the payment of dividends on Veterans' Reopened Insurance policies. Authorizes the payment of higher interest rates for amounts payable to beneficiaries under NSLI, Veterans Special Life Insurance, and U.S. Government Life Insurance policies in cases where such payments are made in equal monthly installments.

=Title IV: Exemption of Veterans' Administration Home Loans from State Anti-Usury Provisions= - Exempts VA guaranteed and insured home loans from State anti-usury laws and constitutional provisions to conform to treatment of mortgages under the National Housing Act.

=Title V: Miscellaneous Provisions= - Makes technical revisions in existing provisions of law, to conform to the Veterans' Health Care Amendments of 1979.

Requires the Director of the National Institute of Occupational Safety and Health, upon request by the VA (or other Federal department, agency, or instrumentality) to request the current mailing address from the Internal Revenue Service of persons whom the VA certifies may have been exposed to occupational hazards. Stipulates that such information shall be used solely for purposes of locating such persons as part of a VA program for certain medical follow-up and benefits notification relating to such possible exposure.

=Title VI: Effective Dates= - Sets forth the effective dates of specified sections of this Act.