Summary: H.R.3122 — 96th Congress (1979-1980)All Information (Except Text)

Bill summaries are authored by CRS.

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (10/01/1980)

(Measure passed Senate, amended)

Amends the Tariff Schedules of the United States to permit the duty-free entry of: (1) specified dying and tanning products; (2) carillons containing over 34 bells; and (3) synthetic tantalum-columbium concentrates.

Suspends, until June 30, 1981, the duties on: (1) wood excelsior; and (2) 2-methyl-4-chlorophenol. Suspends, until June 30, 1984, the duty on certain forms of zinc.

Reduces from 15 percent to four percent the duty on certain ceramic insulates used in spark plugs until June 30, 1981.

Directs the Secretary of the Treasury to admit free of duty (or refund duty already paid): (1) 47 carillon bells and all accompanying parts and accessories for the use of Wake Forest University in North Carolina; (2) 49 such bells and parts for the use of the University of Florida; and (3) certain roof tiles purchased by the Chinese Cultural and Community Center in Pennsylvania.

Extends until June 30, 1982, the duty free entry of: (1) a telescope and associated articles for the use of the Canada-France-Hawaii Telescope Project at Mauna Kea, Hawaii; and (2) synthetic rutile.

Suspends the duty on certain cobalt alloys until June 30, 1982.

Extends the duty-free entry of bicycle lighting sets and parts until June 30, 1983. Revises the list of parts eligible for duty-free entry.

Authorizes the retroactive duty-free treatment of manganese ore which entered the United States between June 30, 1979, and January 1, 1980.

Revises the definition of rubber for purposes of such schedules to include substances which cannot meet specified tests after the addition of fillers, extenders, pigments, or chemicals.

Amends the Trade Agreements Act of 1979 to make technical corrections in the tariff treatment of watches. Stipulates that the ad valorem duties imposed on iron and steel products are in addition to specified rates of duty. Exempts flight simulating machines, balloons, gliders, and airplanes from the duty-free treatment proclaimed for articles certified for use in civil aircraft.

Permits the duty-free entry of field glasses, opera glasses, and prism binoculars.

Extends, until June 30, 1984, the duty-free entry of feathers and downs.

Directs the Secretary to admit duty-free, or refund the duty for, an organ for Ohio Wesleyan University and organ components for St. Paul's Episcopal Church in Riverside, Connecticut.

Requires wire, for tariff purposes, to be in coils (currently may be cut to length). Reduces the duty on cold-formed steel bars, other than alloy steel, from 8.5 percent to 5 percent and 7.5 percent after December 31, 1981.

Exempts deepwater ports from coverage under any provisions of title 19 (customs duties) the United States Code.