Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Fish and Wildlife Conservation Act of 1979

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Fish and Wildlife Conservation Act of 1980

Official Titles

Official Title as Enacted

An act to assist the States in developing fish and wildlife conservation plans and actions, and for other purposes.

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

A bill to assist the States in developing fish and wildlife conservation plans, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (9)

Date Actions Overview
09/29/1980Public Law 96-366.
09/29/1980Signed by President.
09/19/1980Measure presented to President.
09/16/1980Resolving differences -- House actions: House agreed to Senate amendments.
09/09/1980Passed/agreed to in Senate: Measure passed Senate, amended.
09/09/1980Committee on Environment and Public Works discharged in Senate.
07/09/1979Passed/agreed to in House: Measure passed House, amended.
05/15/1979Reported to House from the Committee on Merchant Marine and Fisheries with amendment, H. Rept. 96-168.
03/28/1979Introduced in House

All Actions (16)

Date Chamber All Actions
09/29/1980Public Law 96-366.
09/29/1980Signed by President.
09/19/1980HouseMeasure presented to President.
09/18/1980Measure enrolled in Senate.
09/18/1980Measure enrolled in House.
09/16/1980HouseHouse agreed to Senate amendments.
09/09/1980SenateMeasure passed Senate, amended.
09/09/1980SenateMeasure considered in Senate.
09/09/1980SenateCommittee on Environment and Public Works discharged in Senate.
07/10/1979SenateReferred to Senate Committee on Environment and Public Welfare.
07/09/1979HouseMeasure passed House, amended.
07/09/1979HouseMeasure considered in House.
07/09/1979HouseMeasure called up under motion to suspend rules and pass in House.
05/15/1979HouseReported to House from the Committee on Merchant Marine and Fisheries with amendment, H. Rept. 96-168.
03/28/1979HouseReferred to House Committee on Merchant Marine and Fisheries.
03/28/1979HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (30)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Merchant Marine and Fisheries03/28/1979 Referred to
05/15/1979 Reported by H.Rept 96-168
Senate Environment and Public Works07/10/1979 Referred to
09/09/1980 Discharged from

No related bill information was received for H.R.3292.


Subjects (8)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.3292. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (09/09/1980)

(Measure passed Senate, amended)

Fish and Wildlife Conservation Act of 1980 - Establishes a program of financial and technical assistance to States for the development and revisions of nongame fish and wildlife conservation plans. Encourages all Federal departments and agencies to utilize their statutory and administrative authorities in furtherance of the policy of this Act.

States that such plans shall: (1) vest overall plan development responsibility in a designated State agency; (2) provide for an inventory of the nongame fish and wildlife, and other appropriate fish and wildlife of value to the public; (3) specify certain identifying and geographical factors relating to such species; (4) identify problems which may adversely affect the plan species and their habitats; (5) determine intended State actions to conserve the plan species and habitats; (6) establish priorities for implementing such actions; (7) provide for monitoring the plan species and the effectiveness of such actions; (8) provide for plan review and revision; (9) ensure public participation in plan development and revision; and (10) provide that the designated State agency consult and coordinate actions with appropriate Federal, State, local, and regional agencies in developing such plans to avoid duplication of effort.

Requires the Secretary of the Interior to approve any such plans or actions which are substantial in character and design unless implementation would threaten the natural stability or continued viability of any plan species concerned. Permits the Secretary to deem certain conservation actions to be reimbursable nongame fish and wildlife projects in the absense of an approved plan under certain conditions.

Directs the Secretary of the Interior to reimburse eligible States for costs incurred in connection with development and revision of conservation plans and actions, subject to specified limitations. Directs the Secretary to issue regulations setting forth the terms and conditions of such reimbursement. Sets forth a formula for allocation of funds for administration and reimbursement of States.

Authorizes Federal agencies to assist any State in developing or revising such plans.

States that nothing in this Act shall affect: (1) State regulation of fish and wildlife; (2) the authority of the Secretary of Agriculture to control predatory or wild animals; and (3) State requirements that acquisitions be from willing sellers.

Authorizes appropriations for the purposes of making reimbursements to States and for administering this Act.

Directs the Director of the U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service to study the most equitable and effective mechanism for funding projects under this Act and submit the results and recommendations to the appropriate congressional committees.