Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

A bill to amend the District of Columbia Self-Government and Governmental Reorganization Act to authorize the Council of the District of Columbia to delegate its authority to issue revenue bonds for undertakings in the area of housing to any housing finance agency established by it and to provide that payments of such bonds may be made without further approval.


Actions Overview (12)

Date
04/12/1980Public Law 96-235.
04/12/1980Signed by President.
04/02/1980Measure presented to President.
04/01/1980Conference report agreed to in House: House agreed to conference report.
03/18/1980Conference report filed: Conference report filed in House, H. Rept. 96-830.
03/11/1980Conference report agreed to in Senate: Senate agreed to conference report.
03/06/1980Conference report filed: Conference report filed in Senate, S. Rept. 96-619.
08/02/1979Passed/agreed to in Senate: Measure passed Senate, amended.
07/27/1979Reported to Senate from the Committee on Governmental Affairs with amendment, S. Rept. 96-262.
05/14/1979Passed/agreed to in House: Measure passed House, amended.
05/08/1979Reported to House from the Committee on the District of Columbia, H. Rept. 96-129.
05/01/1979Introduced in House

All Actions (22)

Date Chamber
04/12/1980Public Law 96-235.
04/12/1980Signed by President.
04/02/1980HouseMeasure presented to President.
04/01/1980Measure enrolled in Senate.
04/01/1980Measure enrolled in House.
04/01/1980HouseHouse agreed to conference report.
03/18/1980HouseConference report filed in House, H. Rept. 96-830.
03/11/1980SenateSenate agreed to conference report.
03/06/1980SenateConference report filed in Senate, S. Rept. 96-619.
11/20/1979SenateConference scheduled in Senate.
10/23/1979HouseConference scheduled in House.
08/02/1979SenateMeasure passed Senate, amended.
08/02/1979SenateMeasure considered in Senate.
08/02/1979SenateCall of calendar in Senate.
07/27/1979SenateReported to Senate from the Committee on Governmental Affairs with amendment, S. Rept. 96-262.
05/16/1979SenateReferred to Senate Committee on Governmental Affairs.
05/14/1979HouseMeasure passed House, amended.
05/14/1979HouseMeasure considered in House.
05/14/1979HouseMeasure called up by unanimous consent in House.
05/08/1979HouseReported to House from the Committee on the District of Columbia, H. Rept. 96-129.
05/01/1979HouseReferred to House Committee on the District of Columbia.
05/01/1979HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (3)

Congress.gov databases include cosponsorship dates (including identification of "original" cosponsors) since 1981 (97th Congress). Prior to 1981, you may be able to find some information online, but often the information is available only in print form.

Cosponsor
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8]
Rep. Harris, Herbert E., II [D-VA-8]
Rep. McKinney, Stewart B. [R-CT-4]

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House District of Columbia05/01/1979 Referred to
05/08/1979 Reported by H.Rept 96-129
Senate Governmental Affairs05/16/1979 Referred to
07/27/1979 Reported by S.Rept 96-262

No related bill information was received for H.R.3824.


Latest Summary (5)

There are 5 summaries for H.R.3824. View summaries

Shown Here:
Conference report filed in Senate (03/06/1980)

(Conference report filed in Senate, S. Rept. 96-619)

Amends the District of Columbia Self-Government and Governmental Reorganization Act to authorize the Council of the District of Columbia to delegate its authority to issue revenue bonds for low- and moderate-income housing undertakings to any housing finance agency established by it. Requires the Council to define what undertakings shall constitute undertakings in the area of primarily low- and moderate-income housing. Exempts from Congressional approval: (1) the expenditure of funds derived from the sale of such bonds; (2) the creation of a security interest in connection with such bonds; and (3) the payment of such bonds.