Summary: H.R.4040 — 96th Congress (1979-1980)All Information (Except Text)

Bill summaries are authored by CRS.

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (09/14/1979)

(Measure passed House, amended, roll call #472 (282-46))

Department of Defense Authorization Act, Fiscal Year 1980 - =Title I: Procurement= - Authorizes appropriations for fiscal year 1980 for use by the armed forces for the procurement of aircraft, missiles, naval vessels, tracked combat vehicles, torpedoes, and other weapons. Earmarks a specified portion of such authorization for the procurement of avionics and cruise missile integration for the B-52 modification program. Stipulates that such funding shall only be available on the condition that the Secretary of Defense report to Congress regarding the uncertainties of the effectiveness of the B-52 as a cruise missile carrier during the next decade and the requirements for maintaining the defense penetration capability of the B-52.

Authorizes appropriations for the United States' share of the cost of NATO's Airborne Early Warning and Control System (AWACS).

Authorizes the reappropriation of unobligated funds previously appropriated for the DDG-2 destroyer modernization program for an additional SSN-68 nuclear attack submarine.

=Title II: Research, Development, Test, and Evaluation= - Authorizes appropriations for fiscal year 1980 for military research, development, test, and evaluation.

Requires the Secretary to report to the Congress by March 1, 1980, regarding the ability of the Multiple Protective Structure system (for the MX missile) to survive a Soviet attack.

=Title III: Active Forces= - Establishes the authorized end strength for active duty personnel for fiscal year 1980 for each of the armed forces.

=Title IV: Reserve Forces= - Prescribes the average strengths for the reserve components of the armed forces for such fiscal year.

Increases from 50 percent to 100 percent the Federal share of the educational expenses incurred by reservists in the Selected Reserve Educational Assistance Program. Revises the repayment obligation of individuals participating in such program who do not participate satisfactorily in training in their reserve unit.

Authorizes the Secretary of the Army to retain officers of the Veterinary Corps on active status until age 60 with the officer's consent.

=Title V: Civilian Personnel= - Sets forth the authorized end strength for civilian personnel within the Department of Defense (DOD) for fiscal year 1980. Allows the Secretary of Defense to apportion such personnel among the various military departments.

=Title VI: Military Training Student Loads= - Prescribes the average military training student loads for each of the armed forces for fiscal year 1980.

=Title VII: Civil Defense= - Amends the Federal Civil Defense Act of 1950 to add a title V, "Enhanced Program for the 1980's". Sets forth elements of an enhanced program of civil defense, including: (1) a survey of existing facilities; (2) nuclear civil protection planning; (3) emergency evacuation plans in nuclear powerplant locations; (4) improvement of warning systems; (5) improvement of radiological defense capabilities; (6) research and development; (7) development of a network of emergency operations control centers; and (8( improvement of emergency public information and training programs and facilities. Authorizes appropriations for fiscal years 1980-1984 for such program. Stipulates that no funds may be appropriated for carrying out the provisions of such Act unless they have been authorized for such purpose by legislation enacted after July 14, 1976.

=Title VIII: General Provisions= - States that the Office of Management and Budget Circular A-76 shall not control the expenditure of military research and development funds which are required to be specifically authorized by law.

Directs the Secretary of Defense to institute actions to ensure that maximum first-year enrollment attained at the Uniformed Services University of the Health Sciences is consistent with the academic capacity of the University and the needs of the uniformed services for medical personnel.

Authorizes the enlistment of individuals over the age of 26 in the reserve components of the armed forces.

Prohibits the DOD from contracting out commercial or industrial functions to circumvent any civilian personnel ceiling unless the Secretary has notified the Congress of any such possible civilian contracting out, and certified that such function has been organized and staffed for the maximum efficient and cost-effective in-house performance.

Revises the stipend payable to individuals participating in the Armed Forces Health Professions Scholarship program. Provides that medical officers, while serving an active duty obligation resulting from a

Stipulates that medical officers while serving an active duty obligation resulting from a military medical education program, shall be paid $9,000 for each year of such service.

Authorizes the advance payment of station housing allowances for members of the uniformed services assigned overseas.

Requires the Secretary of Defense to submit an annual report to specified congressional committees assessing the readiness status of NATO military forces. Specifies findings which are to be included in such report.

Amends the Department of Defense Appropriation Authorization Act, 1976, to direct the Secretary to submit quarterly acquisition reports to Congress for those major defense systems which are estimated to require financing above a specified level.

Authorizes appropriations for fiscal year 1980 to the Secretary of Defense to provide assistance for the 1980 Olympic winter games, as authorized by the Department of Defense Appropriation Authorization Act, 1979.

Prohibits the use of funds authorized in this Act to reduce personnel, equipment, or other military functions at Guantanamo Bay, Cuba.

Directs the President to prepare and submit to Congress by January 15, 1980, a plan for reforming existing law providing for the registration and induction of persons into the Armed Forces. Requires that such plan include recommendations with respect to: using schools (1) resuming registration under the Military Selective Service Act; (2) establishing a Centralized method of automatic registration and other records; (3) granting the President the authority to induct registrants into the Armed Forces in the interest of national defense; (4) whether women should be subject to registration and induction; (5) providing authority for the President to induct persons into the Individual Ready Reserve; (6) possible changes in the organization and operation of the Selective Service System; and (7) volunteer or public service work as an alternative to military service.

Declares it the sense of the Congress that the Selective Service System should remain independent of any other agency.

Directs the Secretary of the Air Force to investigate the Titan II missile systems located in the U.S., and report to Congress on the findings and recommendations for any needed improvements.

Provides for the reimbursement of overseas travel expenses of dependents of junior enlisted personnel.

Directs the DOD to use domestically produced alcohol or alcohol-gasoline blends in its vehicles to the maximum extent feasible.

Amends the Uniformed Services Survivors' Benefits Amendments of 1978 to extend the cut-off date to March 31, 1980, for National Guardsmen and reservists (under the age of 60) to elect coverage under the Survivor Benefit program.

Amends the Department of Defense Appropriation Authorization Act, 1978, to extend to October 1, 1981, the date by which the DOD must complete the six percent reduction in senior-grade civilian personnel.