Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Military Personnel and Civilian Employees' Claims and Hostage Relief Act of 1980

Official Titles

Official Title as Enacted

An act to provide for the settlement and payment of claims of United States civilian and military personnel against the United States for losses resulting from acts of violence directed against the United States Government or its representatives in a foreign country or from an authorized evacuation of personnel from a foreign country.

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

A bill to provide for the settlement and payment of claims of civilian and military personnel against the United States for losses in connection with the evacuation of such personnel from a foreign country.


Actions Overview (10)

Date Actions Overview
12/12/1980Public Law 96-519.
12/12/1980Signed by President.
12/03/1980Measure presented to President.
12/01/1980Resolving differences -- Senate actions: Senate receded from its amendments.
10/02/1980Resolving differences -- House actions: House disagreed to Senate amendments.
10/01/1980Passed/agreed to in Senate: Measure passed Senate, amended.
08/01/1980Reported to Senate from the Committee on the Judiciary, S. Rept. 96-882.
04/21/1980Passed/agreed to in House: Measure passed House, amended.
03/27/1980Reported to House from the Committee on the Judiciary with amendment, H. Rept. 96-858.
12/11/1979Introduced in House

All Actions (18)

Date Chamber All Actions
12/12/1980Public Law 96-519.
12/12/1980Signed by President.
12/03/1980HouseMeasure presented to President.
12/03/1980Measure enrolled in Senate.
12/03/1980Measure enrolled in House.
12/01/1980SenateSenate receded from its amendments.
10/02/1980HouseHouse disagreed to Senate amendments.
10/01/1980SenateMeasure passed Senate, amended.
10/01/1980SenateMeasure considered in Senate.
10/01/1980SenateCall of calendar in Senate.
08/01/1980SenateReported to Senate from the Committee on the Judiciary, S. Rept. 96-882.
04/22/1980SenateReferred to Senate Committee on the Judiciary.
04/21/1980HouseMeasure passed House, amended.
04/21/1980HouseMeasure considered in House.
04/21/1980HouseMeasure called up under motion to suspend rules and pass in House.
03/27/1980HouseReported to House from the Committee on the Judiciary with amendment, H. Rept. 96-858.
12/11/1979HouseReferred to House Committee on the Judiciary.
12/11/1979HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (12)

Congress.gov databases include cosponsorship dates (including identification of "original" cosponsors) since 1981 (97th Congress). Prior to 1981, you may be able to find some information online, but often the information is available only in print form.

Cosponsor
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-22]
Rep. Harris, Herbert E., II [D-VA-8]
Rep. Brown, Clarence, Jr. [R-OH-7]
Rep. Lowry, Mike [D-WA-7]
Rep. Lloyd, James F. [D-CA-35]
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-36]
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2]
Rep. Mazzoli, Romano L. [D-KY-3]
Rep. McClory, Robert [R-IL-13]
Rep. Kindness, Thomas N. [R-OH-8]
Rep. Barnes, Michael D. [D-MD-8]
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-25]

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Judiciary12/11/1979 Referred to
03/27/1980 Reported by H.Rept 96-858
Senate Judiciary04/22/1980 Referred to
08/01/1980 Reported by S.Rept 96-882

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (5)

There are 5 summaries for H.R.6086. View summaries

Shown Here:
House disagreed to Senate amendment (10/02/1980)

(House disagreed to Senate amendments)

Amends the Military Personnel and Civilian Employees' Claims Act of 1964 to provide for maximum payment by the United States of $40,000 in personal property claims by members of the uniformed services or civilian employees of the United States incident to evacuations from a foreign country after December 31, 1978.

Requires: (1) that the evacuation after December 31, 1978, was authorized by competent authority which was in response to political unrest or hostile acts, and that damage or loss resulted from such evacuation; or (2) that damage or loss resulted from acts of mob violence, terrorist attacks, or other hostile acts directed against the U.S. government or its officers or employees.

Sets forth the order and priority of payment in the event the claimant is deceased.

States that such claim must be submitted in writing within two years after it accrues, or within one year after enactment of this Act, whichever is later.

Requires each agency to issue regulations governing claims settlements. Prohibits further adjudication of specified claims settled under this Act, unless such claims have not been paid.

Subrogates the United States to any rights or claims the claimant may have against the foreign country in which the damage or loss occurred, upon payment of such claim.

States that no funds may be obligated or expended pursuant to this Act before fiscal year 1981, except to the extent provided in advance in appropriation Acts. Requires that any payments made pursuant to this Act before fiscal year 1981 be made from funds appropriated before the date of enactment of this Act.