Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

A concurrent resolution authorizing the printing of "Federal Election Campaign Laws relating to the United States House of Representatives".


Actions Overview (5)

Date Actions Overview
04/15/1980Passed/agreed to in Senate: Measure passed Senate.
04/02/1980Reported to Senate from the Committee on Rules and Administration, S. Rept. 96-653.
03/10/1980Passed/agreed to in House: Measure passed House.
03/05/1980Reported to House from the Committee on House Administration, H. Rept. 96-804.
02/22/1980Introduced in House

All Actions (11)

Date Chamber All Actions
04/15/1980SenateMeasure passed Senate.
04/15/1980SenateMeasure considered in Senate.
04/15/1980SenateCall of calendar in Senate.
04/02/1980SenateReported to Senate from the Committee on Rules and Administration, S. Rept. 96-653.
03/12/1980SenateReferred to Senate Committee on Rules and Administration.
03/10/1980HouseMeasure passed House.
03/10/1980HouseMeasure considered in House.
03/10/1980HouseMeasure called up as privileged matter in House.
03/05/1980HouseReported to House from the Committee on House Administration, H. Rept. 96-804.
02/22/1980HouseReferred to House Committee on House Administration.
02/22/1980HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (0)

Congress.gov databases include cosponsorship dates (including identification of "original" cosponsors) since 1981 (97th Congress). Prior to 1981, you may be able to find some information online, but often the information is available only in print form.


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Administration02/22/1980 Referred to
03/05/1980 Reported by H.Rept 96-804
Senate Rules and Administration03/12/1980 Referred to
04/02/1980 Reported by S.Rept 96-653

No related bill information was received for H.Con.Res.283.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.Con.Res.283. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/22/1980)

Authorizes the printing, as a House document, of "Federal Election Campaign Laws Relating to the United States House of Representatives."

Authorizes the printing, in addition to the usual number of copies, of 20,000 copies of such document of which 5,000 shall be for the use of the Committee on House Administration and 15,000 for distribution to candidates for the House of Representatives and for political committees supporting them.