Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

A joint resolution to authorize and request the President to issue a proclamation honoring the memory of Walt Disney on the 25th Anniversary of his contribution to the American dream.


Actions Overview (7)

Date
02/28/1980Public Law 96-197.
02/28/1980Signed by President.
02/19/1980Measure presented to President.
02/18/1980Passed/agreed to in Senate: Measure passed Senate.
02/13/1980Passed/agreed to in House: Measure passed House.
02/13/1980Committee on Post Office and Civil Service discharged in House.
01/22/1980Introduced in House

All Actions (13)

Date Chamber
02/28/1980Public Law 96-197.
02/28/1980Signed by President.
02/19/1980HouseMeasure presented to President.
02/19/1980Measure enrolled in Senate.
02/19/1980Measure enrolled in House.
02/18/1980SenateMeasure passed Senate.
02/18/1980SenateMeasure considered in Senate.
02/18/1980SenateMeasure called up by unanimous consent in Senate.
02/13/1980HouseMeasure passed House.
02/13/1980HouseMeasure considered in House.
02/13/1980HouseCommittee on Post Office and Civil Service discharged in House.
01/22/1980HouseReferred to House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service.
01/22/1980HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (131)

Congress.gov databases include cosponsorship dates (including identification of "original" cosponsors) since 1981 (97th Congress). Prior to 1981, you may be able to find some information online, but often the information is available only in print form.

Cosponsor
Rep. Anderson, Glenn M. [D-CA-32]
Rep. Applegate, Douglas [D-OH-18]
Rep. AuCoin, Les [D-OR-1]
Rep. Barnard, Doug, Jr. [D-GA-10]
Rep. Beard, Edward [D-RI-2]
Rep. Bingham, Jonathan B. [D-NY-22]
Rep. Blanchard, James [D-MI-18]
Rep. Brown, Clarence, Jr. [R-OH-7]
Rep. Burton, John [D-CA-5]
Rep. Burton, Phillip [D-CA-6]
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-10]
Rep. Edwards, Mickey [R-OK-5]
Rep. Harkin, Tom [D-IA-5]
Rep. Ichord, Richard H. [D-MO-8]
Rep. Lujan, Manuel, Jr. [R-NM-1]
Rep. Maguire, Andrew [D-NJ-7]
Rep. Quayle, Dan [R-IN-4]
Rep. Watkins, Wes [D-OK-3]
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2]
Rep. Wolff, Lester L. [D-NY-6]
Rep. Young, Robert A. [D-MO-2]
Rep. Addabbo, Joseph P. [D-NY-7]
Rep. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI-2]
Rep. Ambro, Jerome A. [D-NY-3]
Rep. Badham, Robert E. [R-CA-40]
Rep. Bafalis, L. A. (Skip) [R-FL-10]
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4]
Rep. Boland, Edward P. [D-MA-2]
Rep. Bonker, Don [D-WA-3]
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3]
Rep. Brodhead, William [D-MI-17]
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36]
Rep. Buchanan, John [R-AL-6]
Rep. Burgener, Clair W. [R-CA-43]
Rep. Carter, Tim Lee [R-KY-5]
Rep. Cavanaugh, John J. [D-NE-2]
Rep. Chappell, Bill, Jr. [D-FL-4]
Rep. Clausen, Don H. [R-CA-2]
Rep. Conte, Silvio O. [R-MA-1]
Rep. Corman, James C. [D-CA-21]
Rep. Corrada, Baltasar [I-PR-At Large]
Rep. D'Amours, Norman E. [D-NH-1]
Rep. Daniel, W. C. (Dan) [D-VA-5]
Rep. Danielson, George E. [D-CA-30]
Rep. de la Garza, E. [D-TX-15]
Rep. Derwinski, Edward J. [R-IL-4]
Rep. Dickinson, William L. [R-AL-2]
Rep. Diggs, Charles C., Jr. [D-MI-13]
Rep. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT-2]
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-27]
Rep. Downey, Thomas J. [D-NY-2]
Rep. Duncan, Robert B. [D-OR-3]
Rep. Carr, Bob [D-MI-6]
Rep. Ertel, Allen E. [D-PA-17]
Rep. Fary, John G. [D-IL-5]
Rep. Findley, Paul [R-IL-20]
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-25]
Rep. Fisher, Joesph L. [D-VA-10]
Rep. Forsythe, Edwin B. [R-NJ-6]
Rep. Frenzel, Bill [R-MN-3]
Rep. Fuqua, Don [D-FL-2]
Rep. Giaimo, Robert N. [D-CT-3]
Rep. Gibbons, Sam [D-FL-7]
Rep. Ginn, Bo [D-GA-1]
Rep. Goldwater, Barry, Jr. [R-CA-20]
Rep. Gore, Albert, Jr. [D-TN-4]
Rep. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA-3]
Rep. Gudger, V. Lamar [D-NC-11]
Rep. Hall, Sam B., Jr. [D-TX-1]
Rep. Hammerschmidt, John P. [R-AR-3]
Rep. Hanley, James M. [D-NY-32]
Rep. Harris, Herbert E., II [D-VA-8]
Rep. Hawkins, Augustus F. [D-CA-29]
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8]
Rep. Heftel, Cecil [D-HI-1]
Rep. Hightower, Jack E. [D-TX-13]
Rep. Holt, Marjorie S. [R-MD-4]
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-34]
Rep. Howard, James J. [D-NJ-3]
Rep. Hubbard, Carroll, Jr. [D-KY-1]
Rep. Huckaby, Thomas J. (Jerry) [D-LA-5]
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2]
Rep. Ireland, Andrew P. [D-FL-8]
Rep. Jenrette, John W., Jr. [D-SC-6]
Rep. Johnson, Harold T. [D-CA-1]
Rep. Johnson, James P. (Jim) [R-CO-4]
Rep. Jones, Ed [D-TN-7]
Rep. Kelly, Richard [R-FL-5]
Rep. Kemp, Jack [R-NY-38]
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-7]
Rep. Kindness, Thomas N. [R-OH-8]
Rep. Kostmayer, Peter H. [D-PA-8]
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-36]
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19]
Rep. Lederer, Raymond F. [D-PA-3]
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-13]
Rep. Levitas, Elliott H. [D-GA-4]
Rep. Long, Gillis W. [D-LA-8]

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Post Office and Civil Service01/22/1980 Referred to
02/13/1980 Discharged from

No related bill information was received for H.J.Res.477.


Subjects (3)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.J.Res.477. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/22/1980)

Authorizes and requests the President to issue a proclamation honoring the memory of Walt Disney on the 25th anniversary of his contribution to the American dream.