Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

National Tourism Policy Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

An original bill to establish a national tourism policy, a Cabinet level coordinating council and a nonprofit corporation as an implementing agency to carry out the national tourism policy.


Actions Overview (10)

Date
12/25/1980Pocket vetoed by President.
12/13/1980Measure presented to President.
12/11/1980Conference report agreed to in House: House agreed to conference report under suspension of rules, roll call #677 (218-84).
12/10/1980Conference report filed: Conference report filed in House, H. Rept. 96-1532.
12/09/1980Conference report agreed to in Senate: Senate agreed to conference report.
07/01/1980Passed/agreed to in House: Measure passed House, amended, in lieu of H. R. 7321.
07/01/1980Committee on Interstate and Foreign Commerce discharged in House.
05/14/1979Passed/agreed to in Senate: Measure passed Senate.
05/08/1979Reported to Senate from the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation, S. Rept. 96-126.
05/08/1979Introduced in Senate

All Actions (18)

Date Chamber
12/25/1980Pocket vetoed by President.
12/13/1980SenateMeasure presented to President.
12/12/1980Measure enrolled in Senate.
12/12/1980Measure enrolled in House.
12/11/1980HouseHouse agreed to conference report under suspension of rules, roll call #677 (218-84).
12/10/1980HouseConference report filed in House, H. Rept. 96-1532.
12/09/1980SenateSenate agreed to conference report.
08/21/1980HouseConference scheduled in House.
07/23/1980SenateConference scheduled in Senate.
07/01/1980HouseMeasure passed House, amended, in lieu of H. R. 7321.
07/01/1980HouseMeasure considered in House.
07/01/1980HouseCommittee on Interstate and Foreign Commerce discharged in House.
05/16/1979HouseReferred to House Committee on Interstate and Foreign Commerce.
05/14/1979SenateMeasure passed Senate.
05/14/1979SenateMeasure considered in Senate.
05/14/1979SenateCall of calendar in Senate.
05/08/1979SenatePlaced on calendar in Senate.
05/08/1979SenateReported to Senate from the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation, S. Rept. 96-126.

Cosponsors (0)

Congress.gov databases include cosponsorship dates (including identification of "original" cosponsors) since 1981 (97th Congress). Prior to 1981, you may be able to find some information online, but often the information is available only in print form.


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Interstate and Foreign Commerce05/16/1979 Referred to
07/01/1980 Discharged from
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation05/08/1979 Reported by S.Rept 96-126

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for S.1097. View summaries

Shown Here:
Conference report filed in House (12/10/1980)

(Conference report filed in House, H. Rept. 96-1532)

National Tourism Policy Act - =Title I: National Tourism Policy= - Declares that the purpose of this title is to establish a cooperative effort between the Federal Government, State and local governments, and other concerned public and private organizations to implement a national tourism policy.

=Title II: United States Travel and Tourism Administration= - Establishes, as an independent entity in the executive branch, the United States Travel and Tourism Administration.

Sets forth the terms of office, competition, powers, and duties of the Administrator and Deputy Administrator of the United States Travel and Tourism Administration.

Authorizes the Administration to assist Congress and the Federal agencies having policy and programmatic responsibilities affecting tourism.

Directs the Administrator, by April 15, 1982, to submit a detailed tourism development plan to the appropriate Congressional committees.

Directs that, upon the request of the Administrator, each Federal agency shall: (1) make its services, personnel, and facilities available, to the maximum extent practicable, to assist the Administration in the performance of its functions; and (2) furnish the Administration, subject to the provisions of applicable law, such information, suggestions, estimates, and statistics as the Administration may request.

Prohibits the Administration from providing or arranging for transportation or accommodations for persons traveling between other countries and the United States, or between points within the United States, in competition with businesses engaged in providing or arranging for such transportation or accommodations.

Directs the General Services Administration to furnish the Administration with appropriate offices, equipment, and supplies.

Directs the Administration to submit budget information, legislative recommendations, prepared testimony for congressional hearings, and reports to the President or to the Office of Management and Budget and, concurrently, to Congress. Directs the Administration to submit an annual report on its activities to the President for transmittal to Congress.

Directs the United States Travel Service to make a specified sum available to the Administration within 30 days of the date of enactment of this Act.

Establishes the Travel and Tourism Advisory Board. Sets forth the membership, competition, and duties of such Board.

Directs the United States Travel Service to complete the transfer of its assets, powers, duties, and privileges to the Administration within 180 days after the date of enactment of this Act. Abolishes the United States Travel Service upon completion of such transfer.

=Title III: Amendments to the International Travel Act= - Authorizes appropriations through fiscal year 1981 to carry out the purposes of such Act.

Authorizes the Secretary of Commerce to provide financial assistance to a region of not less than two States or portions of two States to assist in the implementation of a regional tourism promotional and marketing program. Declares that any such program shall serve as a demonstration project for future program development for regional tourism promotion.

Extends until September 30, 1981, the time limit for the reduction in the number of employees of the United States Travel Service.

Prohibits the Secretary of Commerce from reducing to a level below that authorized for fiscal year 1979: (1) the number of United States Travel Service employees in offices in foreign countries; and (2) the amount of funds appropriated pursuant to this Act for financing the activities of such foreign offices.