Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Official Titles

Official Title as Enacted

An act to authorize the voluntary interservice transfer of officers between the commissioned corps of the National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration and the Armed Forces, to authorize advance payments of pay and allowances to officers of such corps under the the same conditions that apply to advance payments to members of the Armed Forces, and to provide officers of such corps the same unemployment compensation benefits that apply to members of the Armed Forces.

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the Act of August 10, 1956, as amended; section 716 of title 10, United States Code; section 1006 of title 37, United States Code; and sections 8501 (1)(B) and 8521 (a)(1) of title 5, United States Code.


Actions Overview (10)

Date Actions Overview
03/25/1980Public Law 96-215.
03/25/1980Signed by President.
03/14/1980Measure presented to President.
12/20/1979Passed/agreed to in House: Measure passed House, amended.
12/11/1979Reported to House from the Committee on Armed Services with amendment, H. Rept. 96-539 (Part III).
11/09/1979Reported to House from the Committee on Merchant Marine and Fisheries, H. Rept. 96-539 (Part II).
10/19/1979Reported to House from the Committee on Ways and Means with amendment, H. Rept. 96-539 (Part I).
09/06/1979Passed/agreed to in Senate: Measure passed Senate.
08/02/1979Reported to Senate from the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation, S. Rept. 96-297.
07/09/1979Introduced in Senate

All Actions (18)

Date Chamber All Actions
03/25/1980Public Law 96-215.
03/25/1980Signed by President.
03/14/1980SenateMeasure presented to President.
03/14/1980Measure enrolled in Senate.
03/11/1980Measure enrolled in House.
03/11/1980SenateSenate agreed to House amendments.
12/20/1979HouseMeasure passed House, amended.
12/20/1979HouseMeasure considered in House.
12/20/1979HouseMeasure called up by unanimous consent in House.
12/11/1979HouseReported to House from the Committee on Armed Services with amendment, H. Rept. 96-539 (Part III).
11/09/1979HouseReported to House from the Committee on Merchant Marine and Fisheries, H. Rept. 96-539 (Part II).
10/19/1979HouseReported to House from the Committee on Ways and Means with amendment, H. Rept. 96-539 (Part I).
09/07/1979HouseReferred jointly to House Committees on Armed Services; Merchant Marine and Fisheries; and Ways and Means.
09/06/1979SenateMeasure passed Senate.
09/06/1979SenateMeasure considered in Senate.
09/06/1979SenateCall of calendar in Senate.
08/02/1979SenateReported to Senate from the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation, S. Rept. 96-297.
07/09/1979SenateReferred to Senate Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.

Cosponsors (2)

Congress.gov databases include cosponsorship dates (including identification of "original" cosponsors) since 1981 (97th Congress). Prior to 1981, you may be able to find some information online, but often the information is available only in print form.

Cosponsor
Sen. Magnuson, Warren G. [D-WA]
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC]

Committees (4)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation07/09/1979 Referred to
08/02/1979 Reported by S.Rept 96-297
House Armed Services09/07/1979 Referred to
12/11/1979 Reported by H.Rept 96-539 Part 3
House Merchant Marine and Fisheries09/07/1979 Referred to
11/09/1979 Reported by H.Rept 96-539 Part 2
House Ways and Means09/07/1979 Referred to
10/19/1979 Reported by H.Rept 96-539 Part 1

No related bill information was received for S.1454.


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for S.1454. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (12/20/1979)

(Measure passed House amended)

Authorizes the President to: (1) transfer and appoint any commissioned officer of the National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration (NOAA) to any armed force; and (2) transfer and appoint any commissioned officer of an armed force to the NOAA. Directs the Secretaries of Defense and Commerce, and the Secretary of the department in which the Coast Guard is operating, to jointly establish procedures for such transfers and appointments.

States that any such transferred officer: (1) may not be assigned precedence or higher rank than he/she held before such transfer; and (2) shall receive retirement and pay credit for his/her creditable service as of the day before the transfer.

Provides that advance payments may be made to members of the uniformed services (presently to members of the armed forces or Public Health Service).

Entitles commissioned officers of the NOAA to the same Federal unemployment compensation coverage as provided for military personnel.