Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to authorize the Assiniboine Tribe and the Blackfeet Tribe to file in the Court of Claims any claims against the United States for damages for delay in payment for lands claimed to be taken in violation of the United States Constitution, and for other purposes


Actions Overview (10)

Date Actions Overview
10/10/1980Public Law 96-434.
10/10/1980Signed by President.
10/02/1980Measure presented to President.
09/30/1980Resolving differences -- Senate actions: Senate agreed to House amendment.
09/29/1980Passed/agreed to in House: Measure passed House, amended.
09/19/1980Reported to House from the Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs with amendment, H. Rept. 96-1358.
07/21/1980Passed/agreed to in Senate: Measure passed Senate, amended.
06/25/1980Reported jointly to Senate from the Select Committee on Indian Affairs with amendment, S. Rept. 96-835.
06/25/1980Reported jointly to Senate from the Committee on the Judiciary with amendment, S. Rept. 96-835.
09/21/1979Introduced in Senate

All Actions (17)

Date Chamber All Actions
10/10/1980Public Law 96-434.
10/10/1980Signed by President.
10/02/1980SenateMeasure presented to President.
10/01/1980Measure enrolled in Senate.
10/01/1980Measure enrolled in House.
09/30/1980SenateSenate agreed to House amendment.
09/29/1980HouseMeasure passed House, amended.
09/29/1980HouseMeasure considered in House.
09/29/1980HouseMeasure called up by consent calendar in House.
09/19/1980HouseReported to House from the Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs with amendment, H. Rept. 96-1358.
07/23/1980HouseReferred to House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs.
07/21/1980SenateMeasure passed Senate, amended.
07/21/1980SenateMeasure considered in Senate.
07/21/1980SenateCall of calendar in Senate.
06/25/1980SenateReported jointly to Senate from the Select Committee on Indian Affairs with amendment, S. Rept. 96-835.
06/25/1980SenateReported jointly to Senate from the Committee on the Judiciary with amendment, S. Rept. 96-835.
09/21/1979SenateReferred jointly to Senate Committee on the Judiciary and Senate Select Committee on Indian Affairs.

Cosponsors (1)

Congress.gov databases include cosponsorship dates (including identification of "original" cosponsors) since 1981 (97th Congress). Prior to 1981, you may be able to find some information online, but often the information is available only in print form.

Cosponsor
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Indian Affairs09/21/1979 Referred to
06/25/1980 Reported by S.Rept 96-835
Senate Judiciary09/21/1979 Referred to
06/25/1980 Reported by S.Rept 96-835
House Interior and Insular Affairs07/23/1980 Referred to
09/19/1980 Reported by H.Rept 96-1358

No related bill information was received for S.1796.


Subjects (9)


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for S.1796. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (09/29/1980)

(Measure passed House, amended)

Confers jurisdiction on the Court of Claims, notwithstanding any lapse of time, statute of limitations, or other legal defenses, over any claim filed by the Assiniboine Tribe for certain lands claimed to have been taken under the Fifth Amendment of the Constitution. Directs that the Court's determination in a prior case, setting the value of the land at 50 cents per acre, is binding on the parties in litigation brought under this Act.

Directs the Court, if entitlement to such Tribe is determined, to compute any award on the basis of established judicial precedent and to compute interest at the rate of five percent per annum. Instructs the Court to disregard the prior offset of the Tribe's own money in the computation of any award, excepting that portion already paid in satisfaction of a previous claim. Entitles the United States to an offset against any judgment entered under this Act of the sums awarded under the prior case. Makes provisions under the Indian Claims Commission Act relative to attorney's fees applicable to this Act.