Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (7)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Public Buildings Act of 1980

Short Titles as Passed Senate for portions of this bill
  • Federal Building Enhancement Act of 1980
  • Public Buildings Cooperative Use Act Amendments of 1980

Short Titles as Introduced

Public Buildings Act of 1979

Short Titles as Introduced for portions of this bill
  • Federal Buildings Enhancement Act of 1979
  • Public Buildings Cooperative Use Act Amendments of 1979

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to establish public buildings policies for the Federal Government, to establish the Public Buildings Services in the General Services Administration, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (4)

Date
08/25/1980Passed/agreed to in House: Measure passed House, amended, in lieu of H. R. 6075.
06/20/1980Passed/agreed to in Senate: Measure passed Senate, amended, roll call #234 (71-8).
05/15/1980Reported to Senate from the Committee on Environment and Public Works with amendment, S. Rept. 96-771.
12/05/1979Introduced in Senate

All Actions (10)

Date Chamber
09/23/1980HouseConference scheduled in House.
09/22/1980SenateConference scheduled in Senate.
08/25/1980HouseMeasure passed House, amended, in lieu of H. R. 6075.
08/25/1980HouseMeasure considered in House.
08/25/1980HouseMeasure called up by unanimous consent in House.
06/20/1980SenateMeasure passed Senate, amended, roll call #234 (71-8).
06/20/1980SenateMeasure considered in Senate.
06/20/1980SenateMeasure called up by unanimous consent in Senate.
05/15/1980SenateReported to Senate from the Committee on Environment and Public Works with amendment, S. Rept. 96-771.
12/05/1979SenateReferred to Senate Committee on Environment and Public Works.

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Environment and Public Works12/05/1979 Referred to
05/15/1980 Reported by S.Rept 96-771

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for S.2080. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (08/25/1980)

(Measure passed House, amended, in lieu fo H.R. 6075)

Amends the Public Buildings Act of 1959 to authorize the Administrator of General Services to issue obligations for purchase by the Secretary of the Treasury, to the extent authorized in appropriation Acts, for financing the acquisition or construction of any public buildings. Directs that the average market yield on outstanding marketable U.S. obligations be taken into consideration in determining the interest for such obligations. Requires approval by the appropriate congressional committees of such acquisition or construction. Makes this Act effective October 1, 1980.