Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Gasohol Competition Act of 1980

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the Clayton Act to prohibit restrictions on the use of credit instruments in the purchase of gasohol.


Actions Overview (9)

Date
12/02/1980Public Law 96-493.
12/02/1980Signed by President.
11/21/1980Measure presented to President.
11/19/1980Resolving differences -- Senate actions: Senate agreed to House amendments.
11/17/1980Passed/agreed to in House: Measure passed House, amended, in lieu of H. R. 7873.
07/25/1980Reported to Senate from the Committee on the Judiciary, S. Rept. 96-868.
06/20/1980Passed/agreed to in Senate: Measure passed Senate, amended.
06/18/1980Reported to Senate from the Committee on the Judiciary with amendment (without written report).
02/04/1980Introduced in Senate

All Actions (16)

Date Chamber
12/02/1980Public Law 96-493.
12/02/1980Signed by President.
11/21/1980SenateMeasure presented to President.
11/21/1980Measure enrolled in Senate.
11/21/1980Measure enrolled in House.
11/19/1980SenateSenate agreed to House amendments.
11/17/1980HouseMeasure passed House, amended, in lieu of H. R. 7873.
11/17/1980HouseMeasure considered in House.
11/17/1980HouseMeasure called up by unanimous consent in House.
07/25/1980SenateReported to Senate from the Committee on the Judiciary, S. Rept. 96-868.
06/23/1980HouseReferred to House Committee on the Judiciary.
06/20/1980SenateMeasure passed Senate, amended.
06/20/1980SenateMeasure considered in Senate.
06/20/1980SenateCall of calendar in Senate.
06/18/1980SenateReported to Senate from the Committee on the Judiciary with amendment (without written report).
02/04/1980SenateReferred to Senate Committee on Finance.

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Finance02/04/1980 Referred to
House Judiciary06/23/1980 Referred to
Senate Judiciary07/25/1980 Reported by S.Rept 96-868

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for S.2251. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (11/17/1980)

(Measure passed House, amended, in lieu of H. R. 7873)

Gasohol Competition Act of 1980 - Amends the Clayton Act to prohibit any person engaged in commerce from placing restrictions on the use of credit instruments in any transaction concerning the sale, resale, or transfer of gasohol or other synthetic motor fuel of equivalent usability where there are no similar restrictions on transactions concerning conventional motor fuel. Allows such person to impose a credit fee for such sale or transfer, provided such fee does not exceed the actual costs of extending the credit.

Prohibits any other condition, restriction, agreement, or understanding wich otherwise discriminates against or unreasonably limits the sale, resale, or transfer of gasohol or other synthetic motor fuel of equivalent usability.

Exempts from such prohibition any person who makes sufficient supplies of gasohol and such synthetic fuels available to customers on the equivalent terms and conditions as such person's conventional motor fuel products.

Provides that nothing in this Act: (1) precludes such person from requiring labeling of pumps dispensing gasohol or synthetic fuel to indicate that such fuels are not manufactured, distributed, or sold by such person; (2) precludes such person from issuing disclaimers of product liability for damage resulting from the use of such fuels; (3) requires such person to provide advertising for such fuels; or (4) requires such person to furnish additional; pumps or facilities for the sale of such fuels.