Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to extend the provisions of the General Exchange Act, as amended, to certain lands in order that they may become parts of the Umatilla and Wallowa National Forests, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (8)

Date
10/09/1980Public Law 96-406.
10/09/1980Signed by President.
10/01/1980Measure presented to President.
09/29/1980Passed/agreed to in House: Measure passed House.
09/19/1980Reported to House from the Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs, H. Rept. 96-1354.
05/05/1980Passed/agreed to in Senate: Measure passed Senate.
04/28/1980Reported to Senate from the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources, S. Rept. 96-669.
03/06/1980Introduced in Senate

All Actions (15)

Date Chamber
10/09/1980Public Law 96-406.
10/09/1980Signed by President.
10/01/1980SenateMeasure presented to President.
10/01/1980Measure enrolled in Senate.
10/01/1980Measure enrolled in House.
09/29/1980HouseMeasure passed House.
09/29/1980HouseMeasure considered in House.
09/29/1980HouseMeasure called up by consent calendar in House.
09/19/1980HouseReported to House from the Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs, H. Rept. 96-1354.
Action By: Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs
05/06/1980HouseReferred to House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs.
05/05/1980SenateMeasure passed Senate.
05/05/1980SenateMeasure considered in Senate.
05/05/1980SenateCall of calendar in Senate.
04/28/1980SenateReported to Senate from the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources, S. Rept. 96-669.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Natural Resources
03/06/1980SenateReferred to Senate Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.

Cosponsors (0)

Congress.gov databases include cosponsorship dates (including identification of "original" cosponsors) since 1981 (97th Congress). Prior to 1981, you may be able to find some information online, but often the information is available only in print form.


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Energy and Natural Resources03/06/1980 Referred to
04/28/1980 Reported by S.Rept 96-669
House Interior and Insular Affairs05/06/1980 Referred to
09/19/1980 Reported by H.Rept 96-1354

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.2398. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (03/06/1980)

Extends the provisions of the General Exchange Act to provide for the conveyance of specified lands in Oregon to the United States. Specifies that such lands, upon acceptance of title, shall become parts of the Umatilla and Wallowa National Forest, Oregon.