Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

Uniformed Services Health Professionals Special Pay Act of 1980

Official Titles

Official Title as Enacted

An act to amend chapter 5 of title 37, United States Code, to revise the special pay provisions for medical officers in the uniformed services and to extend the special pay provisions for other health professionals in the uniformed services, and for other purposes.

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend chapter 5 of title 37, United States Code, to revise the special pay provisions for medical officers in the Armed Forces and to extend the special pay provisions for other health professionals in the uniformed services, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (8)

Date Actions Overview
06/28/1980Public Law 96-284.
06/28/1980Signed by President.
06/27/1980Measure presented to President.
06/26/1980Resolving differences -- Senate actions: Senate agreed to House amendment.
06/23/1980Passed/agreed to in House: Measure passed House, amended, in lieu of H. R. 6982.
05/28/1980Passed/agreed to in Senate: Measure passed Senate, amended.
05/15/1980Reported to Senate from the Committee on Armed Services with amendment, S. Rept. 96-749.
03/20/1980Introduced in Senate

All Actions (14)

Date Chamber All Actions
06/28/1980Public Law 96-284.
06/28/1980Signed by President.
06/27/1980SenateMeasure presented to President.
06/27/1980Measure enrolled in Senate.
06/27/1980Measure enrolled in House.
06/26/1980SenateSenate agreed to House amendment.
06/23/1980HouseMeasure passed House, amended, in lieu of H. R. 6982.
06/23/1980HouseMeasure considered in House.
06/23/1980HouseMeasure called up by unanimous consent in House.
05/28/1980SenateMeasure passed Senate, amended.
05/28/1980SenateMeasure considered in Senate.
05/28/1980SenateCall of calendar in Senate.
05/15/1980SenateReported to Senate from the Committee on Armed Services with amendment, S. Rept. 96-749.
03/20/1980SenateReferred to Senate Committee on Armed Services.

Cosponsors (0)

Congress.gov databases include cosponsorship dates (including identification of "original" cosponsors) since 1981 (97th Congress). Prior to 1981, you may be able to find some information online, but often the information is available only in print form.


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Armed Services03/20/1980 Referred to
05/15/1980 Reported by S.Rept 96-749

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (13)


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for S.2460. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (06/23/1980)

(Measure passed House, amended, in lieu of H. R. 6982)

Uniformed Services Health Professionals Special Pay Act of 1980 - Provides special and additional pay for physicians in the Armed Forces who are on active duty for a period of not less than one year. Sets forth a schedule for such special pay providing that: (1) physicians below pay grade 0-7 are to receive between $1,200 and $10,000 per year based on years of creditable service; and (2) physicians above pay grade 0-6 are to receive $1,000 per year.

Entitles a physician eligible for special pay to an additional $10,000 annual payment for any 12 month period during which he or she is not undergoing medical internship or initial residency training, based on years of creditable service, upon the execution of a written agreement under which the officer agrees to remain on active duty for at least one year.

Authorizes additional special pay (from $2,000 to $5,000 based on years of creditable service) for those physicians eligible for special pay who are board certified (under regulations prescribed by this Act).

Allows a qualified medical officer an incentive special pay not to exceed $8,000 for any 12 month period during which the officer is not undergoing medical internship or initial residency training. Limits the amount paid in special pay in any fiscal year to an amount equal to six percent of the total amount paid in such year for special pay.

States that such a physician must agree in writing to remain on active duty for a period of not less than one year beginning on the date the officer accepts the award of such special pay. Permits the Secretary of Defense, or the Secretary of the military department concerned, to terminate at any time any officer's entitlement to special pay.

Includes, in the computation of creditable service: (1) all periods which the officer spent in medical internship or residency training during which the officer was not on active duty; and (2) all periods of active service in the Medical Corps of the Army or Navy, as medical officer of the Air Force, or as a Public Health Service (PHS) medical officer.

Entitles a medical officer of the Public Health Service who is on active duty for a period of at least one year to special pay at specified rates.

Allows a qualified medical officer an incentive special pay not to exceed $8,000 for any 12 month period during which the officer is not undergoing medical internship or initial residency training. Limits the amount paid in special pay in any fiscal year to an amount equal to six percent of the total amount paid in such year for special pay.

States that such a physician must agree in writing to remain on active duty for a period of not less than one year beginning on the date the office accepts the award of such special pay. Permits the Secretary of Health and Human Services to terminate, pursuant to regulations, at any time a PHS officer's entitlement to special pay.

Directs that such pay be paid annually at the beginning of the twelve-month period of entitlement. Provides that any such officer who terminates active duty service within the twelve-month period shall reimburse to the United States any amount applicable to the unserved portion of such duty. Provides for special pay for dentists, optometrists, and veterinarians. Authorizes the Secretary of Defense to pay four months basic pay to dental officers of the Army, Navy, or Air Force, and the Secretary of Health and Human Services to provide such pay to medical officers (including dental officers) of the Public Health Service, when such officers: (1) serve on active duty in a critical specialty; (2) complete initial active duty obligations; and (3) enter into a written agreement to remain on active duty for one additional year. Allows each Secretary to determine the method of such payments.

Prohibits the amount of special pay to which an officer is entitled to be included in computing the amount of any increase in pay, retirement pay, severance pay, or readjustment pay.

Authorizes the Secretary of Defense to conduct a review every two years of the special pay for health professionals. Requires a report to Congress on the results of such review.