Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to improve the administration of the Historic Sites, Buildings and Antiquities Act of 1935 (49 Stat. 666).


Actions Overview (9)

Date
09/08/1980Public Law 96-344.
09/08/1980Signed by President.
08/28/1980Measure presented to President.
08/18/1980Resolving differences -- Senate actions: Senate agreed to House amendment.
07/31/1980Passed/agreed to in House: Measure passed House, amended.
07/31/1980Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs discharged in House.
05/22/1980Passed/agreed to in Senate: Measure passed Senate, amended.
05/15/1980Reported to Senate from the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources with amendment, S. Rept. 96-754.
05/08/1980Introduced in Senate

All Actions (15)

Date Chamber
09/08/1980Public Law 96-344.
09/08/1980Signed by President.
08/28/1980SenateMeasure presented to President.
08/28/1980Measure enrolled in Senate.
08/27/1980Measure enrolled in House.
08/18/1980SenateSenate agreed to House amendment.
07/31/1980HouseMeasure passed House, amended.
07/31/1980HouseMeasure considered in House.
07/31/1980HouseCommittee on Interior and Insular Affairs discharged in House.
05/28/1980HouseReferred to House Committee on Interior and Insular Affairs.
05/22/1980SenateMeasure passed Senate, amended.
05/22/1980SenateMeasure considered in Senate.
05/22/1980SenateCall of calendar in Senate.
05/15/1980SenateReported to Senate from the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources with amendment, S. Rept. 96-754.
05/08/1980SenateReferred to Senate Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.

Cosponsors (0)

Congress.gov databases include cosponsorship dates (including identification of "original" cosponsors) since 1981 (97th Congress). Prior to 1981, you may be able to find some information online, but often the information is available only in print form.


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Energy and Natural Resources05/08/1980 Referred to
05/15/1980 Reported by S.Rept 96-754
House Interior and Insular Affairs05/28/1980 Referred to
07/31/1980 Discharged from

No related bill information was received for S.2680.


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for S.2680. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (07/31/1980)

(Measure passed House, amended)

Permits the Secretary of the Interior to provide financial assistance for the maintenance and protection of the Folger Library and the Corcoran Gallery of Art in Washington, D.C.

Authorizes the Secretary to cooperate with the Accokeek Foundation in the operation and maintenance of the National Colonial Farm, Accokeek, Maryland. Makes funds appropriated to the Secretary for operation and maintenance of the farm available to the Foundation for such purposes.

Establishes the Georgia O'Keeffe National Historic Site at Abiquiu, New Mexico. Requires the Secretary of the Interior, within three fiscal years from the effective date of this Act, to submit to specified Congressional committees a comprehensive general management plan for such site.

Revises the boundaries of the Golden Gate National Recreation Area, California. Lengthens the term of office of members of the Golden Gate National Recreation Area Advisory Commission from three to five years. Specifies that the term of those Commission members who have been either appointed or reappointed subsequent to January 1, 1979, shall be extended so as to expire not before June 1, 1985. Extends the termination date for such Commission by ten years.

Amends the Boston National Historical Park Act of 1974 to revise the boundaries of such park. Revises the boundaries of the Pinnacles National Monument, California.

Revises the boundaries of the Golden Spike National Historic Site, Utah. Requires the Secretary, within two years from the effective date of this Act, to submit to specified Congressional committees, a report on the feasibility of providing passenger rail service from the city of Ogden, Utah, to such historic site.

Amends the General Authorities Act of 1970 to require the Secretary of the Interior to indicate in each national park system new area study, the theme which an area represents as indicated in the National Park System Plan. Requires the annual listing of new candidate national park areas to be accompanied by a synopsis, for each report previously submitted, of the current and changed condition of the resource integrity of the area and other relevant factors.

Amends the Land and Water Conservation Fund Act of 1965 to terminate the requirement that funds credited to the Land and Water Conservation Fund which have not been authorized for expenditure within two fiscal years be transferred to miscellaneous receipts of the United States Treasury.

Redefines the term 'single visit' to mean a more or less continuous stay within a designated area. Specifies that payment of a single visit admission fee shall authorize exits from and reentries to a single designated area for a period of from one to 15 days.

Requires the Secretary of the Interior and the Secretary of Agriculture to establish procedures for the issuance of a lifetime admission permit to any citizen of, or person domiciled in, the United States, if such citizen or person applied for such permit, and is blind or permanently disabled. Allows such a permit holder to receive a 50 percent reduction in special recreation facilities entrance fees.

Amends the Act which established the Lowell National Historical Park, Massachusetts, to specify that any revenues or other assets acquired by the Lowell National Historical Park Advisory Commission by donation, lease or sale of property, or fees for services shall be available to the Commission, without fiscal year limitation, to be used for any authorized function of the Commission. Directs the Secretary of the Interior to require audits of the financial records of the Commission to be conducted not less frequently than once each year.

Directs the Secretary of the Interior to inform the public of the contributions of Representative Ryan to the creation of the Gateway National Recreation Area in the States of New York and New Jersey. Increases to 15 the membership of the Gateway National Recreation Area Advisory Commission.

Redesignates Moores Creek National Military Park in North Carolina as Moores Creek National Battlefield.

Increases to 11 the membership of the San Antonio Missions National Historical Park Advisory Commission.

Amends the National Trails System Act to designate the Overmountain Victory Trail in Virginia, Tennessee, North Carolina and South Carolina as a national historic trail and a component of the National Trails System.

Directs the Secretary of the Interior to conduct a study to determine appropriate measures to protect and interpret for the benefit and education of the public, the Falls of the Ohio located in the States of Kentucky and Indiana.

Amends the Wild and Scenic Rivers Act to authorize the Secretary of the Interior to establish an advisory body for the area of the Upper Missouri River which is a component of the Wild and Scenic Rivers System.

Authorizes the Secretary to investigate, and report to specified Congressional committees, sites associated with the life and work of George Meany.

Directs the Secretary, in consultation with the National Aeronautics and Space Administration, the Department of Defense, and any other entities considered by the Secretary to be appropriate, to conduct a study of locations and events associated with the historical theme of Man in Space. Requires such study, including potential action alternatives, to be submitted to specified Congressional committees no later than one complete fiscal year after the effective date of this Act.