Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to designate the "Thomas J. McIntyre Federal Building".


Actions Overview (8)

Date
12/24/1980Public Law 96-588.
12/24/1980Signed by President.
12/18/1980Measure presented to President.
12/16/1980Resolving differences -- Senate actions: Senate agreed to House amendments.
12/15/1980Passed/agreed to in House: Measure passed House, amended.
12/13/1980Passed/agreed to in Senate: Measure passed Senate, amended.
12/13/1980Committee on Environment and Public Works discharged in Senate.
11/18/1980Introduced in Senate

All Actions (13)

Date Chamber
12/24/1980Public Law 96-588.
12/24/1980Signed by President.
12/18/1980SenateMeasure presented to President.
12/18/1980Measure enrolled in Senate.
12/17/1980Measure enrolled in House.
12/16/1980SenateSenate agreed to House amendments.
12/15/1980HouseMeasure passed House, amended.
12/15/1980HouseMeasure considered in House.
12/15/1980HouseMeasure called up by unanimous consent in House.
12/13/1980SenateMeasure passed Senate, amended.
12/13/1980SenateMeasure considered in Senate.
12/13/1980SenateCommittee on Environment and Public Works discharged in Senate.
11/18/1980SenateReferred to Senate Committee on Environment and Public Works.

Cosponsors (2)

Congress.gov databases include cosponsorship dates (including identification of "original" cosponsors) since 1981 (97th Congress). Prior to 1981, you may be able to find some information online, but often the information is available only in print form.

Cosponsor
Sen. Durkin, John A. [D-NH]

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Environment and Public Works11/18/1980 Referred to
12/13/1980 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (8)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for S.3212. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (12/15/1980)

(Measure passed House, amended)

Designates the building known as the Federal Building in Portsmouth, New Hampshire, as the Thomas J. McIntyre Federal Building.

Designates the Veterans' Administration Medical Center in Topeka, Kansas, as the Colmery-O'Neil Veterans' Administration Medical Center. Directs the Committee on Rules and Administration to place appropriate markers or inscriptions at suitable locations within the clincal center in order to commemorate and designate such building.

Designates the Northeastern Forest Experiment Station in Durham, New Hampshire, as the Louis C. Wyman Forest Experiment Station, effective January 3, 1981.