Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

An original concurrent resolution setting forth the recommended congressional budget for the United States Government for the fiscal years 1980, 1981, and 1982 and revising the Second Concurrent Resolution on the Budget for fiscal year 1979.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
04/25/1979Passed/agreed to in Senate: Measure passed Senate, amended, roll call #61 (64-20).
04/12/1979Reported to Senate from the Committee on the Budget, S. Rept. 96-68.
04/12/1979Introduced in Senate

All Actions (7)

Date All Actions
05/15/1979Text as passed Senate inserted in H.Con.Res. 107.
Action By: Senate
04/25/1979Measure passed Senate, amended, roll call #61 (64-20).
Action By: Senate
04/25/1979Measure considered in Senate.
Action By: Senate
04/24/1979Measure considered in Senate.
Action By: Senate
04/23/1979Measure considered in Senate.
Action By: Senate
04/23/1979Measure called up by unanimous consent in Senate.
Action By: Senate
04/12/1979Reported to Senate from the Committee on the Budget, S. Rept. 96-68.

Cosponsors (0)

Congress.gov databases include cosponsorship dates (including identification of "original" cosponsors) since 1981 (97th Congress). Prior to 1981, you may be able to find some information online, but often the information is available only in print form.


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Budget04/12/1979 Reported by S.Rept 96-68

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.Con.Res.22. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (04/25/1979)

(Measure passed Senate, amended, roll call #61 (64-20))

Sets forth the congressional budget for the United States Government for fiscal years 1980, 1981, and 1982. States that the recommended levels of Federal revenues are: $503,600,000,000 for 1980; $576,200,000,000 for 1981; and $615,000,000,000 for 1982. States that the amount by which the aggregate levels of Federal revenues should be increased is $100,000,000 for fiscal year 1980 and $4,700,000,000 for fiscal year 1981; and decreased $49,900,000,000 for fiscal year 1982.

States that the appropriate levels of total new budget authority for fiscal years 1980, 1981, and 1982 respectively are: $600,300,000,000; $637,200,000,000; and $686,800,000,000.

Lists the appropriate levels of total budget outlays for fiscal years 1980, 1981, and 1982 respectively as follows: $532,600,000,000; $575,600,000,000; and $614,100,000,000.

States that the amounts of the deficit or surplus in the budget which are appropriate in the light of economic conditions are as follows: a deficit of $29,000,000,000 in fiscal year 1980; and surpluses of $600,000,000 in fiscal year 1981 and $900,000,000 in fiscal year 1982.

Sets the appropriate level of the public debt at: $890,700,000,000 for 1980, and the amount by which the temporary statutory limit on such debt should be accordingly increased is $60,700,000,000; $921,200,000,000 for 1981, and the amount by which the temporary statutory limit on such debt should be increased is $91,200,000,000; and $959,500,000,000 for 1982, and the amount by which the temporary statutory limit on such debt should be increased is $129,500,000,000.

Specifies the appropriate levels of new budget authority and the estimated budget outlays for each major functional category.

Revises the second concurrent resolution on the budget for fiscal year 1979.