Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

An original concurrent resolution revising the congressional budget for the United States Government for fiscal years 1980, 1981, and 1982.


Actions Overview (13)

Date Actions Overview
11/08/1979Resolving differences -- House actions: House agreed to Senate amendment with an amendment, roll call #637 (205-190).
11/07/1979Resolving differences -- Senate actions: Senate agreed to House amendment with an amendment, roll call #392 (65-27).
11/07/1979Conference report agreed to in Senate: Senate agreed to conference report (Second Conference Report).
11/02/1979Conference report filed: Conference report filed in House, H. Rept. 96-582 (Second Conference Report).
11/01/1979Conference report filed: Conference report filed in Senate, S. Rept. 96-399 (Second Conference Report).
10/31/1979Resolving differences -- Senate actions: Senate disagreed to certain House amendments.
10/31/1979Resolving differences -- Senate actions: Senate agreed to conference report.
10/23/1979Conference report filed: Conference report filed in Senate, S. Rept. 96-376.
10/23/1979Conference report filed: Conference report filed in House, H. Rept. 96-541.
09/27/1979Passed/agreed to in House: Measure passed House, amended.
09/19/1979Passed/agreed to in Senate: Measure passed Senate, amended, roll call #300 (62-36).
08/24/1979Reported to Senate from the Committee on the Budget, S. Rept. 96-311.
08/24/1979Introduced in Senate

All Actions (23)

Date Chamber All Actions
11/08/1979HouseHouse agreed to Senate amendment with an amendment, roll call #637 (205-190).
11/07/1979SenateSenate agreed to House amendment with an amendment, roll call #392 (65-27).
11/07/1979SenateSenate agreed to conference report (Second Conference Report).
11/02/1979HouseConference report filed in House, H. Rept. 96-582 (Second Conference Report).
11/01/1979SenateConference report filed in Senate, S. Rept. 96-399 (Second Conference Report).
10/31/1979SenateSenate disagreed to certain House amendments.
10/31/1979SenateSenate agreed to conference report.
10/31/1979SenateConference scheduled in Senate (Second Conference).
10/23/1979HouseConference scheduled in House (Second Conference).
10/23/1979SenateConference report filed in Senate, S. Rept. 96-376.
10/23/1979HouseConference report filed in House, H. Rept. 96-541.
10/05/1979SenateConference scheduled in Senate.
09/27/1979HouseConference scheduled in House.
09/27/1979HouseMeasure passed House, amended.
09/27/1979HouseMeasure considered in House.
09/27/1979HouseMeasure called up by special rule in House.
09/19/1979SenateMeasure passed Senate, amended, roll call #300 (62-36).
09/19/1979SenateMeasure considered in Senate.
09/18/1979SenateMeasure considered in Senate.
09/17/1979SenateMeasure considered in Senate.
09/14/1979SenateMeasure considered in Senate.
09/14/1979SenateMeasure called up by unanimous consent in Senate.
08/24/1979SenateReported to Senate from the Committee on the Budget, S. Rept. 96-311.

Cosponsors (0)

Congress.gov databases include cosponsorship dates (including identification of "original" cosponsors) since 1981 (97th Congress). Prior to 1981, you may be able to find some information online, but often the information is available only in print form.


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Budget08/24/1979 Reported by S.Rept 96-311

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (9)


Latest Summary (6)

There are 6 summaries for S.Con.Res.36. View summaries

Shown Here:
House agreed to Senate amendment with amendment (11/08/1979)

(House agreed to Senate amendment with an amendment, roll call #637 (205-190))

Sets forth the congressional budget for the United States Government for fiscal year 1980.

Sets the recommended level of Federal revenues for such year at $517,800,000,000. Recommends an increase of $2,400,000,000 in the aggregate level of Federal revenues.

States that the appropriate level of total new budget authority for fiscal year 1980 is $638,000,000,000. Sets the appropriate level of total budget outlays at $547,600,000,000.

States that a budget deficit of $29,800,000,000 for fiscal year 1980 would be appropriate in light of economic conditions.

Sets the appropriate level of the public debt at $886,400,000,000 in fiscal year 1980, with an increase in the statutory debt limit of $7,400,000,000.

Sets forth the appropriate levels of new budget authority and estimated budget outlays for each major functional category of the budget in fiscal year 1980.

Sets forth the congressional budget for the United States Government for fiscal years 1981 and 1982.

Recommends aggregate levels of Federal revenues of $610,200,000,000 in fiscal year 1981 and $671,800,000,000 in fiscal 1982, with an increase in Federal revenues of $10,200,000,000 in 1981 and a decrease of $34,800,000,000 in 1982.

States that the appropriate level of new budget authority for fiscal year 1981 is $664,900,000,000 and $747,600,000,000 for fiscal year 1982. Sets the appropriate level of total budget outlays at $600,500,000,000 in fiscal year 1981 and at $653,000,000,000 in fiscal year 1982.

Recommends budget surpluses of $9,700,000,000 and $18,800,000,000 in fiscal years 1981 and 1982 respectively.

Sets the appropriate level of the public debt at $911,200,000,000 in fiscal year 1981, with an increase in the temporary debt limit of $32,200,000,000. Establishes the level of the public debt at $939,100,000,000 for fiscal year 1982, with an increase of $60,100,000,000 in the temporary debt limit.

Sets forth the corresponding appropriate levels of new budget authority and estimated budget outlays for each major functional category of the budget in fiscal years 1981 and 1982.

Sets forth the House projections of budget aggregates for fiscal years 1981 and 1982.

Directs each standing committee of the House of Representatives which has jurisdiction over entitlement programs to include in its required March 15, 1980, report to the Budget Committee specific recommendations for funding mechanisms which would enable the Congress to exercise more fiscal control over such entitlements.

Directs the Budget Committee to submit to the House such recommendations as it deems appropriate based on such reports.

Reaffirms the commitment of Congress to find a way to relate accurately the outlays of off-budget Federal entities to the budget. Estimates such outlays to be $16,000,000,000 in fiscal year 1980.