Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A joint resolution to provide for designation of the first Friday of March as "Teacher Day, United States of America".


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
02/26/1980Passed/agreed to in Senate: Measure passed Senate, amended.
02/20/1980Reported to Senate from the Committee on the Judiciary with amendment, S. Rept. 96-576.
01/29/1980Introduced in Senate

All Actions (7)

Date All Actions
02/27/1980Measure indefinitely postponed in Senate, H. J. Res. 267 passed in lieu.
Action By: Senate
02/27/1980Senate vitiated its action on passage of 02/26/80.
Action By: Senate
02/26/1980Measure passed Senate, amended.
Action By: Senate
02/26/1980Measure considered in Senate.
Action By: Senate
02/26/1980Call of calendar in Senate.
Action By: Senate
02/20/1980Reported to Senate from the Committee on the Judiciary with amendment, S. Rept. 96-576.
01/29/1980Referred to Senate Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (32)


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Judiciary01/29/1980 Referred to
02/20/1980 Reported by S.Rept 96-576

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for S.J.Res.135. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (02/26/1980)

(Measure passed Senate, amended)

Authorizes and requests the President to designate March 7, 1980, as "Teacher Day, United States of America."