Committees: H.R.1400 — 97th Congress (1981-1982)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Armed Services01/28/1981 Referred to
05/11/1982 Markup by
06/10/1982 Reported by H.Rept 97-80 Part 2
H.Rept 97-80 Part 3
House Armed Services Subcommittee on Military Personnel and Compensation02/06/1981 Referred to
03/11/1982 Hearings by
04/27/1982 Markup by
04/27/1982 Reported by
House Veterans' Affairs01/28/1981 Referred to
05/12/1981 Markup by
05/19/1981 Reported by H.Rept 97-80 Part 1
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Education, Training and Employment03/17/1981 Referred to
04/23/1981 Hearings by
05/07/1981 Markup by
05/07/1981 Reported by