Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (7)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Protection Island National Wildlife Refuge Act

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Protection Island National Wildlife Refuge Act

Short Titles as Reported to House

Protection Island National Wildlife Refuge Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Protection Island National Wildlife Refuge Act

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Protection Island National Wildlife Refuge Act

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Protection Island National Wildlife Refuge Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

A bill to establish the Protection Island National Wildlife Refuge, Jefferson County, State of Washington.


Actions Overview (10)

Date
10/15/1982Became Public Law No: 97-333.
10/15/1982Signed by President.
10/05/1982Presented to President.
09/30/1982Resolving differences -- House actions: House Agreed to Senate Amendments by Unanimous Consent.
06/09/1982Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with amendments by Voice Vote.
05/26/1982Committee on Environment and Public Works. Reported to Senate by Senator Chafee with amendments. With written report No. 97-426.
02/02/1982Senate Committee on Energy and Natural Resources discharged by Unanimous Consent.
12/15/1981Passed/agreed to in House: Passed House (Amended) by Voice Vote.
12/14/1981Reported to House (Amended) by House Committee on Merchant Marine and Fisheries. Report No: 97-403.
01/29/1981Introduced in House

All Actions (32)

Date Chamber
10/15/1982Became Public Law No: 97-333.
10/15/1982Signed by President.
10/05/1982HousePresented to President.
10/05/1982SenateMeasure Signed in Senate.
09/30/1982HouseHouse Agreed to Senate Amendments by Unanimous Consent.
06/09/1982SenatePassed Senate with amendments by Voice Vote.
06/09/1982SenateConsidered by Senate.
06/09/1982SenateS.Up.Amdt.1018 Amendment agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
06/09/1982SenateS.Up.Amdt.1018 Proposed by Senator Stevens for Senator Gorton. Providing for a transfer of ownership, jurisdiction, and control over the Jones Island National Wildlife Refuge to the State of Washington for use as a public recreation area to be managed in accordance with the applicable laws of Washington.
05/26/1982SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under Regular Orders. Calendar No. 608.
05/26/1982SenateCommittee on Environment and Public Works. Reported to Senate by Senator Chafee with amendments. With written report No. 97-426.
05/06/1982SenateCommittee on Environment and Public Works incorporated provisions of related measures S. 327 in reported measure.
05/06/1982SenateCommittee on Environment and Public Works. Ordered to be reported with amendments favorably.
04/28/1982SenateSubcommittee on Environmental Pollution. Incorporated provisions of related measure S.327 as approved.
Action By: Senate Environment and Public Works Subcommittee on Environmental Pollution
04/28/1982SenateSubcommittee on Environmental Pollution. Approved for full committee consideration with amendments favorably.
Action By: Senate Environment and Public Works Subcommittee on Environmental Pollution
02/08/1982SenateSubcommittee on Environmental Pollution. Hearings held.
Action By: Senate Environment and Public Works Subcommittee on Environmental Pollution
02/02/1982SenateRereferred to Senate Committee on Environment and Public Works.
02/02/1982SenateSenate Committee on Energy and Natural Resources discharged by Unanimous Consent.
12/15/1981SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice, and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
12/15/1981HousePassed House (Amended) by Voice Vote.
12/15/1981HouseCalled up by House Under Suspension of Rules.
12/14/1981HousePlaced on Union Calendar No: 246.
12/14/1981HouseReported to House (Amended) by House Committee on Merchant Marine and Fisheries. Report No: 97-403.
12/09/1981HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended).
Action By: Committee on Merchant Marine and Fisheries
12/09/1981HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Merchant Marine and Fisheries
12/07/1981HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended).
Action By: House Merchant Marine and Fisheries Subcommittee on Fisheries and Wildlife Conservation and the Environment
12/07/1981HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Merchant Marine and Fisheries Subcommittee on Fisheries and Wildlife Conservation and the Environment
10/15/1981HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Merchant Marine and Fisheries Subcommittee on Fisheries and Wildlife Conservation and the Environment
02/20/1981HouseReferred to Subcommittee on Fish and Wildlife.
Action By: Committee on Merchant Marine and Fisheries
02/06/1981HouseExecutive Comment Requested from Interior.
01/29/1981HouseReferred to House Committee on Merchant Marine and Fisheries.
01/29/1981HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (6)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 01/28/1981
Rep. Foley, Thomas S. [D-WA-5]* 01/28/1981
Rep. Lowry, Mike [D-WA-7]* 01/28/1981
Rep. Morrison, Sid [R-WA-4]* 01/28/1981
Rep. Pritchard, Joel [R-WA-1]* 01/28/1981
Rep. Swift, Al [D-WA-2]* 01/28/1981

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Merchant Marine and Fisheries01/29/1981 Referred to
12/09/1981 Markup by
12/14/1981 Reported by H.Rept 97-403
House Merchant Marine and Fisheries Subcommittee on Fisheries and Wildlife Conservation and the Environment02/20/1981 Referred to
10/15/1981 Hearings by
12/07/1981 Markup by
12/07/1981 Reported by
Senate Energy and Natural Resources12/15/1981 Referred to
02/02/1982 Discharged from
Senate Environment and Public Works02/02/1982 Re-Referred to
05/06/1982 Markup by
05/26/1982 Reported by S.Rept 97-426
Senate Environment and Public Works Subcommittee on Environmental Pollution02/08/1982 Hearings by
04/28/1982 Markup by
04/28/1982 Reported by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (5)

There are 5 summaries for H.R.1486. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (06/09/1982)

(Measure passed Senate, amended)

Protection Island National Wildlife Refuge Act - Establishes the Protection Island National Wildlife Refuge in the State of Washington.

Sets forth requirements with respect to Federal acquisition of lands within the refuge. Requires the Secretary of the Interior to acquire land subject to a life use or, at the owner's option, to an extended use reservation for a term of years in the case of any person who is the owner of land as of January 1, 1982, that is within the refuge and contains a structure suitable for residential use. Permits owners of property within the refuge to offer to sell their property to the Secretary. Authorizes the Secretary to purchase such properties immediately and take immediate possession of them. Prohibits the Secretary from acquiring property within the refuge by eminent domain for two years after Congress has appropriated funds for acquisition of the refuge, except as may be necessary to control public access to concentrated nesting sites within the refuge.

Authorizes appropriations beginning in fiscal year 1983.

Requires the Secretary to transfer ownership, jurisdiction, and control over the Jones Island National Wildlife Refuge to the State of Washington for use as a public recreation area.