Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Hostage Indemnification Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

A bill to provide for certain benefits for the United States citizens held hostage in Iran.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/03/1981Introduced in House

All Actions (13)

Date
02/27/1981Referred to Subcommittee on Civil Service.
Action By: Committee on Post Office and Civil Service
02/27/1981Referred to Subcommittee on Compensation and Employee Benefits.
Action By: Committee on Post Office and Civil Service
02/27/1981Executive Comment Requested from ICA, OMB, OPM, Treasury, State.
02/12/1981Referred to Subcommittee on International Operations.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
02/10/1981Referred to Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
02/09/1981Referred to Subcommittee on Military Personnel and Compensation.
Action By: Committee on Armed Services
02/09/1981Executive Comment Requested from DOD.
02/03/1981Referred to House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/03/1981Referred to House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/03/1981Referred to House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/03/1981Referred to House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/03/1981Referred to House Committee on Armed Services.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/03/1981Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (5)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Armed Services02/03/1981 Referred to
House Armed Services Subcommittee on Military Personnel and Compensation02/09/1981 Referred to
House Foreign Affairs02/03/1981 Referred to
House Foreign Affairs Subcommittee on International Operations02/12/1981 Referred to
House Post Office and Civil Service02/03/1981 Referred to
House Post Office and Civil Service Subcommittee on Compensation and Employee Benefits02/27/1981 Referred to
House Post Office and Civil Service Subcommittee on Civil Service02/27/1981 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs02/03/1981 Referred to
House Ways and Means02/03/1981 Referred to
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Health02/10/1981 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.1584.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1584. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/03/1981)

Hostage Indemnification Act - Requires any individual who was taken hostage during the seizure of the U.S. embassy in Iran and any family member of such individual to be paid for medical and health care expenses not covered by insurance for three years. Compensates each hostage for personal property lost during captivity.

Credits each hostage who is a Foreign Service officer or member of the Armed Forces with additional retirement benefits for each day spent in captivity. Authorizes the President to promote each such hostage. Makes each such hostage eligible for early retirement.

Deems military personnel who were hostages to have been missing for purposes of determining the amount of leave accumulated during captivity. Entitles such personnel to 15 days of leave.

Deems any military personnel who died in Iran during the aborted rescue mission to have died of a service-connected disability for purposes of determining survivors' and dependents' educational benefits.

Directs the President to pay a specified amount in lieu of any claims against Iran to each hostage. Excludes such payment from gross income for Federal tax purposes and from State and local taxation. Makes specified tax provisions applicable to such hostages.

Expresses the sense of Congress that any hostage should be permitted to select among available service assignments according to such hostage's preference.

Commends the former hostages for their display of courage, fortitude, and dignity during their captivity.