Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7]* 02/05/1981
Rep. Barnard, Doug, Jr. [D-GA-10]* 02/05/1981
Rep. Beard, Robin [R-TN-6]* 02/05/1981
Rep. Bedell, Berkley W. [D-IA-6]* 02/05/1981
Rep. Bowen, David R. [D-MS-2]* 02/05/1981
Rep. Brown, Clarence, Jr. [R-OH-7]* 02/05/1981
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36]* 02/05/1981
Rep. Broyhill, James T. [R-NC-10]* 02/05/1981
Rep. Burton, John [D-CA-5]* 02/05/1981
Rep. Chappell, Bill, Jr. [D-FL-4]* 02/05/1981
Rep. Coelho, Anthony Lee [D-CA-15]* 02/05/1981
Rep. Collins, James M. [R-TX-3]* 02/05/1981
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8]* 02/05/1981
Rep. Downey, Thomas J. [D-NY-2]* 02/05/1981
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4]* 02/05/1981
Rep. Ferraro, Geraldine A. [D-NY-9]* 02/05/1981
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-25]* 02/05/1981
Rep. Forsythe, Edwin B. [R-NJ-6]* 02/05/1981
Rep. Frenzel, Bill [R-MN-3]* 02/05/1981
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 02/05/1981
Rep. Garcia, Robert [D-NY-21]* 02/05/1981
Rep. de la Garza, E. [D-TX-15]* 02/05/1981
Rep. Goldwater, Barry, Jr. [R-CA-20]* 02/05/1981
Rep. Gramm, Phil [D-TX-6]* 02/05/1981
Rep. Gray, William H., III [D-PA-2]* 02/05/1981
Rep. Guyer, Tennyson [R-OH-4]* 02/05/1981
Rep. Hall, Sam B., Jr. [D-TX-1]* 02/05/1981
Rep. Hightower, Jack E. [D-TX-13]* 02/05/1981
Rep. Hollenbeck, Harold C. [R-NJ-9]* 02/05/1981
Rep. Howard, James J. [D-NJ-3]* 02/05/1981
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2]* 02/05/1981
Rep. Ireland, Andrew P. [D-FL-8]* 02/05/1981
Rep. Kazen, Abraham, Jr. [D-TX-23]* 02/05/1981
Rep. Long, Clarence D. [D-MD-2]* 02/05/1981
Rep. Mattox, James A. [D-TX-5]* 02/05/1981
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13]* 02/05/1981
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-22]* 02/05/1981
Rep. Pease, Donald J. [D-OH-13]* 02/05/1981
Rep. Pepper, Claude [D-FL-14]* 02/05/1981
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 02/05/1981
Rep. Pickle, J. J. [D-TX-10]* 02/05/1981
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5]* 02/05/1981
Rep. Seiberling, John F. [D-OH-14]* 02/05/1981
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1]* 02/05/1981
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 02/05/1981
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4]* 02/05/1981
Rep. Weaver, James H. [D-OR-4]* 02/05/1981
Rep. Whitehurst, G. William [R-VA-2]* 02/05/1981
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2]* 02/05/1981
Rep. Wirth, Timothy [D-CO-2]* 02/05/1981
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3]* 02/05/1981
Rep. Won Pat, Antonio B. [D-GU-At Large]* 02/05/1981
Rep. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD-3] 02/18/1981
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-21] 02/18/1981
Rep. Fenwick, Millicent H. [R-NJ-5] 02/18/1981
Rep. Udall, Morris K. [D-AZ-2] 02/18/1981
Rep. Ginn, Bo [D-GA-1] 02/18/1981
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-13] 02/18/1981
Rep. Boggs, Corinne C. (Lindy) [D-LA-2] 02/18/1981
Rep. Fascell, Dante B. [D-FL-15] 02/18/1981
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 02/18/1981
Rep. Lowry, Mike [D-WA-7] 02/18/1981
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 02/18/1981
Rep. Ottinger, Richard L. [D-NY-24] 02/18/1981
Rep. Pritchard, Joel [R-WA-1] 02/23/1981
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-11] 02/23/1981
Rep. Marriott, David Daniel [R-UT-2] 02/23/1981
Rep. Pashayan, Charles, Jr. [R-CA-17] 02/23/1981
Rep. Panetta, Leon [D-CA-16] 02/23/1981
Rep. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI-2] 02/23/1981
Rep. Lott, Trent [R-MS-5] 02/23/1981
Rep. Guarini, Frank J. [D-NJ-14] 02/23/1981
Rep. Johnston, Eugene (Gene) [R-NC-6] 02/23/1981
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 02/23/1981
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-9] 03/02/1981
Rep. Crockett, George W., Jr. [D-MI-13] 03/02/1981
Rep. Benedict, Cleve [R-WV-2] 03/02/1981
Rep. Morrison, Sid [R-WA-4] 03/02/1981
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-10] 03/02/1981
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 03/02/1981
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 03/02/1981
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-7] 03/02/1981
Rep. Loeffler, Tom [R-TX-21] 03/18/1981
Rep. Evans, Billy Lee [D-GA-8] 03/18/1981
Rep. McCloskey, Paul N., Jr. [R-CA-12] 04/06/1981
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3] 04/27/1981
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 05/12/1981
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11] 05/13/1981
Rep. Bailey, Donald A. [D-PA-21] 06/02/1981
Rep. Smith, Albert L., Jr. [R-AL-6] 06/16/1981
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 07/16/1981
Rep. Santini, James D. [D-NV-98] 10/02/1981
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-22] 10/02/1981
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 05/05/1982
Rep. Martin, James G. [R-NC-9] 05/05/1982
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-20] 06/30/1982
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 07/15/1982