Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Official Titles

Official Title as Enacted

An act to authorize certain employees of the United States Department of Agriculture charged with the enforcement of animal quarantine laws to carry firearms for self-protection and to improve the quality of table grapes for marketing in the United States.

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

A bill to authorize certain employees of the Department of Agriculture to carry firearms in the performance of their duties.


Actions Overview (9)

Date Actions Overview
10/14/1982Became Public Law No: 97-312.
10/14/1982Signed by President.
10/02/1982Presented to President.
09/30/1982Resolving differences -- House actions: House Agreed to Senate Amendments by Unanimous Consent.
09/29/1982Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment and an amendment to the Title by Voice Vote.
09/22/1982Committee on Agriculture. Reported to Senate by Senator Helms without amendment. With written report No. 97-569.
05/18/1982Passed/agreed to in House: Passed House (Amended) by Voice Vote.
05/14/1982Reported to House (Amended) by House Committee on Agriculture. Report No: 97-515.
02/24/1981Introduced in House

All Actions (27)

Date Chamber All Actions
10/14/1982Became Public Law No: 97-312.
10/14/1982Signed by President.
10/02/1982HousePresented to President.
10/01/1982SenateMeasure Signed in Senate.
09/30/1982HouseHouse Agreed to Senate Amendments by Unanimous Consent.
09/29/1982SenatePassed Senate with an amendment and an amendment to the Title by Voice Vote.
09/29/1982SenateConsidered by Senate.
09/29/1982SenateS.Up.Amdt.1346 Amendment SU 1346 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
09/29/1982SenateS.Up.Amdt.1346 Proposed by Senator Baker for Senator Hayakawa. To improve the quality of table grapes for marketing in the United States.
09/22/1982SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under Regular Orders. Calendar No. 836.
09/22/1982SenateCommittee on Agriculture. Reported to Senate by Senator Helms without amendment. With written report No. 97-569.
09/15/1982SenateCommittee on Agriculture. Ordered to be reported in lieu of S. 2313 without amendment favorably.
05/20/1982SenateReceived in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture.
05/18/1982HousePassed House (Amended) by Voice Vote.
05/18/1982HouseCalled up by House Under Suspension of Rules.
05/14/1982HousePlaced on Union Calendar No: 310.
05/14/1982HouseReported to House (Amended) by House Committee on Agriculture. Report No: 97-515.
04/29/1982HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended).
Action By: Committee on Agriculture
04/29/1982HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Agriculture
03/25/1982HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended).
Action By: House Agriculture Subcommittee on Department Operations, Research, and Foreign Agriculture
03/25/1982HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Agriculture Subcommittee on Department Operations, Research, and Foreign Agriculture
03/04/1982HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Agriculture Subcommittee on Department Operations, Research, and Foreign Agriculture
04/02/1981HouseExecutive Comment Requested from USDA.
04/02/1981HouseExecutive Comment Requested from USDA.
02/27/1981HouseReferred to Subcommittee on Department Operations, Research, and Foreign Agriculture.
Action By: Committee on Agriculture
02/24/1981HouseReferred to House Committee on Agriculture.
02/24/1981HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Agriculture02/24/1981 Referred to
04/29/1982 Markup by
05/14/1982 Reported by H.Rept 97-515
House Agriculture Subcommittee on Department Operations, Research, and Foreign Agriculture02/27/1981 Referred to
03/04/1982 Hearings by
03/25/1982 Markup by
03/25/1982 Reported by
Senate Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry05/20/1982 Referred to
09/15/1982 Markup by
09/22/1982 Reported by S.Rept 97-569

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.R.2035. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (09/29/1982)

(Measure passed Senate, amended)

Authorizes certain Department of Agriculture employees engaged in animal disease control work ("tick inspectors") to carry firearms for self-protection in the performance of their official duties, in accordance with regulations issued by the Secretary of Agriculture and the Attorney General.

Amends the Agricultural Adjustment Act, as reenacted and amended by the Agricultural Marketing Agreement Act of 1937, to include table grapes among the imported agricultural commodities required to meet Federal marketing order quality standards.