Committees: H.R.2035 — 97th Congress (1981-1982)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Agriculture02/24/1981 Referred to
04/29/1982 Markup by
05/14/1982 Reported by H.Rept 97-515
House Agriculture Subcommittee on Department Operations, Research, and Foreign Agriculture02/27/1981 Referred to
03/04/1982 Hearings by
03/25/1982 Markup by
03/25/1982 Reported by
Senate Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry05/20/1982 Referred to
09/15/1982 Markup by
09/22/1982 Reported by S.Rept 97-569