Committees: H.R.2160 — 97th Congress (1981-1982)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Agriculture02/25/1981 Referred to
03/03/1982 Markup by
03/08/1982 Reported by H.Rept 97-446
House Agriculture Subcommittee on Domestic Marketing, Consumer Relations, and Nutrition03/04/1981 Referred to
09/24/1981 Markup by
09/24/1981 Reported by
Senate Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry03/10/1982 Referred to
03/31/1982 Markup by
04/19/1982 Reported by S.Rept 97-334