Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

A bill to amend title 39 of the United States Code to provide that owners of passenger motor vehicles leased to the United States Postal Service shall be exempt from the payment of State taxes and fees on those vehicles.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
03/04/1981Introduced in House

All Actions (7)

Date All Actions
07/29/1981Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Post Office and Civil Service Subcommittee on Postal Personnel and Modernization
05/26/1981Unfavorable Executive Comment Received From Postal Service.
04/08/1981Unfavorable Executive Comment Received From OMB.
03/10/1981Referred to Subcommittee on Postal Personnel and Modernization.
Action By: Committee on Post Office and Civil Service
03/10/1981Executive Comment Requested from OMB, Postal Service.
03/04/1981Referred to House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/04/1981Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Post Office and Civil Service03/04/1981 Referred to
House Post Office and Civil Service Subcommittee on Postal Personnel and Modernization03/10/1981 Referred to
07/29/1981 Hearings by

No related bill information was received for H.R.2288.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2288. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/04/1981)

Exempts the owner of any passenger motor vehicle leased by the United States Postal Service from payment of any State or local tax or fee on such vehicle.

Authorizes the Postal Service to maintain any such vehicle.