Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Vander Jagt, Guy [R-MI-9]* 03/12/1981
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2]* 03/12/1981
Rep. Hightower, Jack E. [D-TX-13]* 03/12/1981
Rep. Coelho, Anthony Lee [D-CA-15]* 03/12/1981
Rep. Albosta, Donald J. [D-MI-10]* 03/12/1981
Rep. Beard, Robin [R-TN-6]* 03/12/1981
Rep. Blanchard, James [D-MI-18]* 03/12/1981
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-12]* 03/12/1981
Rep. Breaux, John B. [D-LA-7]* 03/12/1981
Rep. Daub, Hal [R-NE-2]* 03/12/1981
Rep. Ford, William D. [D-MI-15]* 03/12/1981
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-8]* 03/12/1981
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19]* 03/12/1981
Rep. Gramm, Phil [D-TX-6]* 03/12/1981
Rep. Zeferetti, Leo C. [D-NY-15]* 03/12/1981
Rep. Roberts, Clint [R-SD-2]* 03/12/1981
Rep. Sawyer, Harold S. [R-MI-5]* 03/12/1981
Rep. Traxler, Bob [D-MI-8]* 03/12/1981
Rep. Walker, Robert S. [R-PA-16]* 03/12/1981
Rep. Jones, Ed [D-TN-7]* 03/12/1981
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-11]* 03/12/1981
Rep. Alexander, Bill [D-AR-1]* 03/12/1981
Rep. Broomfield, William S. [R-MI-19]* 03/12/1981
Rep. Loeffler, Tom [R-TX-21]* 03/12/1981
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12]* 03/12/1981
Rep. Watkins, Wes [D-OK-3]* 03/12/1981
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-23]* 03/12/1981
Rep. Pursell, Carl D. [R-MI-2]* 03/12/1981
Rep. Richmond, Frederick W. [D-NY-14]* 03/12/1981
Rep. Synar, Mike [D-OK-2]* 03/12/1981
Rep. Bowen, David R. [D-MS-2]* 03/12/1981
Rep. Kemp, Jack [R-NY-38]* 03/12/1981
Rep. Davis, Robert W. [R-MI-11]* 03/12/1981
Rep. Crockett, George W., Jr. [D-MI-13]* 03/12/1981
Rep. Ritter, Don [R-PA-15]* 03/12/1981
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-12]* 03/12/1981
Rep. Yatron, Gus [D-PA-6]* 03/12/1981
Rep. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD-1]* 03/12/1981
Rep. Dunn, Jim [R-MI-6]* 03/12/1981
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-7]* 03/12/1981
Rep. Nowak, Henry [D-NY-37]* 03/12/1981
Rep. Benedict, Cleve [R-WV-2]* 03/12/1981
Rep. Brodhead, William [D-MI-17]* 03/12/1981
Rep. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI-2]* 03/12/1981
Rep. Luken, Thomas A. [D-OH-2]* 03/12/1981
Rep. Bailey, Donald A. [D-PA-21]* 03/12/1981
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7] 04/07/1981
Rep. AuCoin, Les [D-OR-1] 04/07/1981
Rep. Barnard, Doug, Jr. [D-GA-10] 04/07/1981
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-3] 04/07/1981
Rep. Boggs, Corinne C. (Lindy) [D-LA-2] 04/07/1981
Rep. Campbell, Carroll A., Jr. [R-SC-4] 04/07/1981
Rep. Chappell, Bill, Jr. [D-FL-4] 04/07/1981
Rep. Collins, James M. [R-TX-3] 04/07/1981
Rep. Corcoran, Tom [R-IL-15] 04/07/1981
Rep. Dougherty, Charles F. [R-PA-4] 04/07/1981
Rep. English, Glenn [D-OK-6] 04/07/1981
Rep. Evans, Billy Lee [D-GA-8] 04/07/1981
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 04/07/1981
Rep. Fountain, L. H. [D-NC-2] 04/07/1981
Rep. Ginn, Bo [D-GA-1] 04/07/1981
Rep. Gradison, Willis D., Jr. [D-OH-1] 04/07/1981
Rep. Gray, William H., III [D-PA-2] 04/07/1981
Rep. Hall, Sam B., Jr. [D-TX-1] 04/07/1981
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 04/07/1981
Rep. Holland, Kenneth L. [D-SC-5] 04/07/1981
Rep. Huckaby, Thomas J. (Jerry) [D-LA-5] 04/07/1981
Rep. Hutto, Earl [D-FL-1] 04/07/1981
Rep. Johnston, Eugene (Gene) [R-NC-6] 04/07/1981
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-13] 04/07/1981
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 04/07/1981
Rep. Madigan, Edward R. [R-IL-21] 04/07/1981
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 04/07/1981
Rep. Pashayan, Charles, Jr. [R-CA-17] 04/07/1981
Rep. Rinaldo, Matthew J. [R-NJ-12] 04/07/1981
Rep. Roemer, Buddy [D-LA-4] 04/07/1981
Rep. Rudd, Eldon D. [R-AZ-4] 04/07/1981
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 04/07/1981
Rep. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL-7] 04/07/1981
Rep. Smith, Virginia [R-NE-3] 04/07/1981
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 04/07/1981
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [D-LA-3] 04/07/1981
Rep. Weber, Vin [R-MN-6] 04/07/1981
Rep. Whitehurst, G. William [R-VA-2] 04/07/1981
Rep. Whitley, Charles O., Sr. [D-NC-3] 04/07/1981
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 04/07/1981
Rep. Bafalis, L. A. (Skip) [R-FL-10] 04/30/1981
Rep. Grisham, Wayne R. [R-CA-33] 04/30/1981
Rep. Jeffries, Jim [R-KS-2] 04/30/1981
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-36] 04/30/1981
Rep. Shumway, Norman D. [R-CA-14] 04/30/1981
Rep. Santini, James D. [D-NV-98] 06/04/1981
Rep. Gregg, Judd [R-NH-2] 06/04/1981
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-27] 06/04/1981
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-12] 06/04/1981
Rep. Lowry, Mike [D-WA-7] 06/04/1981
Rep. Miller, Clarence E. [R-OH-10] 06/04/1981
Rep. Coughlin, Lawrence [R-PA-13] 06/25/1981
Rep. Dannemeyer, William E. [R-CA-39] 06/25/1981
Rep. Hopkins, Larry J. [R-KY-6] 06/26/1981