Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

A bill to provide for the payment, out of the proceeds of gold belonging to the Government of Czechoslovakia, of certified awards of nationals of the United States against the Government of Czechoslovakia and to provide for the release of such proceeds to Czechoslovakia after all such awards and certain other debts are paid.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
03/19/1981Introduced in House

All Actions (9)

Date
12/08/1981For Further Action See H.R.5125.
06/24/1981Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee.
Action By: House Foreign Affairs Subcommittee on International Economic Policy and Trade
06/24/1981Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Foreign Affairs Subcommittee on International Economic Policy and Trade
06/24/1981Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee.
Action By: House Foreign Affairs Subcommittee on Europe and the Middle East
06/24/1981Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Foreign Affairs Subcommittee on Europe and the Middle East
03/26/1981Referred to Subcommittee on International Economic Policy and Trade.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
03/26/1981Referred to Subcommittee on Europe and the Middle East.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
03/19/1981Referred to House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/19/1981Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (5)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bonker, Don [D-WA-3]* 03/19/1981
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19]* 03/19/1981
Rep. Shamansky, Bob [D-OH-12] 04/08/1981
Rep. Findley, Paul [R-IL-20] 06/09/1981
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 11/12/1981

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Foreign Affairs03/19/1981 Referred to
House Foreign Affairs Subcommittee on Europe and the Middle East03/26/1981 Referred to
06/24/1981 Markup by
06/24/1981 Reported by
House Foreign Affairs Subcommittee on International Economic Policy and Trade03/26/1981 Referred to
06/24/1981 Markup by
06/24/1981 Reported by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2631. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/19/1981)

Requires the U.S. Foreign Claims Settlement Commission to determine the validity and amount of claims against Czechoslovakia: (1) by U.S. nationals for losses resulting from the taking by Czechoslovakia of certain property between specified dates; and (2) by any person who properly filed such a claim which was denied solely because such person was not a U.S. national on the date of the taking.

Directs the Secretary of State to negotiate a lump sum agreement with Czechoslovakia providing for payment of all certified awards against Czechoslovakia. Prohibits such agreement from taking effect if Congress vetoes it or if it is not submitted within a specified time.

Directs the Secretary of the Treasury to take possession of and sell all Czechoslovakia gold located in the United States if such a settlement agreement acceptable to the Congress has not been made within a specified time. Directs the Secretary of State, if such an agreement is not reached, to negotiate with Great Britain and France to obtain permission to sell Czechoslovakia gold located in Great Britain. Directs the Secretary of the Treasury to sell all such gold and invest the proceeds in safe U.S. and foreign securities for payment of the awards of U.S. nationals. Reserves for Czechoslovakia the first right, for a ten-day period, before any other purchaser to purchase any such gold offered for sale. Requires all interest and other income from such investments to be deposited into the Czechoslovakian Claims Fund for distribution to those U.S. nationals holding certified awards against Czechoslovakia. Provides for the payment to Czechoslovakia of any balance remaining from such gold sale and in such Fund after: all such awards are paid; Treasury Department expenses are recovered; and certain Czechoslovakia debts to the United States are paid.

Denies jurisdiction to any court over any claim against the United States for actions taken under this Act. Authorizes appropriations for fiscal years 1982 and beyond.