Committees: H.R.3809 — 97th Congress (1981-1982)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Energy and Commerce06/04/1981 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Energy Conservation and Power06/08/1981 Referred to
06/10/1982 Hearings by
House Interior and Insular Affairs06/04/1981 Referred to
03/17/1982 Markup by
04/27/1982 Reported by H.Rept 97-491 Part 1
House Interior and Insular Affairs Subcommittee on Energy and the Environment06/17/1981 Referred to
07/09/1981 Hearings by
10/29/1981 Markup by
10/29/1981 Reported by
House Rules06/04/1981 Referred to
House Rules Subcommittee on Rules of the House10/20/1981 Referred to
House Armed Services06/17/1982 Referred to
07/15/1982 Markup by
07/19/1982 Reported by H.Rept 97-491 Part 2
House Armed Services Subcommittee on Procurement and Military Nuclear Systems06/22/1982 Referred to
07/14/1982 Markup by
07/14/1982 Reported by
House Judiciary09/09/1982 Referred to
09/15/1982 Discharged from
House Merchant Marine and Fisheries09/09/1982 Referred to
09/15/1982 Discharged from