Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

A bill to improve the operation of the Fishermen's Contingency Fund established to compensate commercial fishermen for damages resulting from oil and gas exploration, development, and production in areas of the Outer Continental Shelf.


Actions Overview (11)

Date
06/30/1982Became Public Law No: 97-212.
06/30/1982Signed by President.
06/30/1982Presented to President.
06/29/1982Resolving differences -- Senate actions: Senate agreed to House amendments to Senate amendment No.1. By Voice Vote.
06/24/1982Resolving differences -- House actions: House Receded and Concurred With an Amendment in Senate Amendment 001.
06/24/1982Resolving differences -- House actions: House Receded and Concurred in Senate Amendments 002, 003, 004, 005.
06/23/1982Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with amendments by Voice Vote.
06/23/1982Committee on Commerce. Reported to Senate by Senator Packwood with amendments. Without written report.
12/15/1981Passed/agreed to in House: Passed House (Amended) by Voice Vote.
12/03/1981Reported to House (Amended) by House Committee on Merchant Marine and Fisheries. Report No: 97-354.
06/04/1981Introduced in House

All Actions (32)

Date Chamber
06/30/1982Became Public Law No: 97-212.
06/30/1982Signed by President.
06/30/1982HousePresented to President.
06/30/1982SenateMeasure Signed in Senate.
06/29/1982SenateSenate agreed to House amendments to Senate amendment No.1. By Voice Vote.
06/24/1982HouseHouse Receded and Concurred With an Amendment in Senate Amendment 001.
06/24/1982HouseHouse Receded and Concurred in Senate Amendments 002, 003, 004, 005.
06/23/1982SenatePassed Senate with amendments by Voice Vote.
06/23/1982SenateConsidered by Senate.
06/23/1982SenateCommittee on Commerce. Reported to Senate by Senator Packwood with amendments. Without written report.
06/23/1982SenateCommittee on Commerce. Ordered to be reported with amendments favorably.
06/23/1982SenateS.Up.Amdt.1042 Amendment agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
06/23/1982SenateS.Up.Amdt.1042 Proposed by Senator Stevens. To extend certain Governing International Fishing Agreements.
12/21/1981SenateCommittee on Commerce received executive comment from Treasury Department. Unfavorable.
12/15/1981SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice, and referred to the Committee on Commerce.
12/15/1981HousePassed House (Amended) by Voice Vote.
12/15/1981HouseCalled up by House Under Suspension of Rules.
12/03/1981HousePlaced on Union Calendar No: 216.
12/03/1981HouseReported to House (Amended) by House Committee on Merchant Marine and Fisheries. Report No: 97-354.
10/27/1981HouseUnfavorable Executive Comment Received From Justice.
09/22/1981HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended).
Action By: Committee on Merchant Marine and Fisheries
09/22/1981HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Merchant Marine and Fisheries
07/21/1981HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended).
Action By: House Merchant Marine and Fisheries Subcommittee on Panama Canal and Outer Continental Shelf
07/21/1981HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Merchant Marine and Fisheries Subcommittee on Panama Canal and Outer Continental Shelf
07/21/1981HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended).
Action By: House Merchant Marine and Fisheries Subcommittee on Fisheries and Wildlife Conservation and the Environment
07/21/1981HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Merchant Marine and Fisheries Subcommittee on Fisheries and Wildlife Conservation and the Environment
06/30/1981HouseReferred to Subcommittee on Panama Canal and Outer Continental Shelf.
Action By: Committee on Merchant Marine and Fisheries
06/11/1981HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Merchant Marine and Fisheries Subcommittee on Fisheries and Wildlife Conservation and the Environment
06/11/1981HouseReferred to Subcommittee on Fisheries and Wildlife Conservation and the Environment.
Action By: Committee on Merchant Marine and Fisheries
06/11/1981HouseExecutive Comment Requested from Commerce, DOT, Interior, Justice, Treasury.
06/04/1981HouseReferred to House Committee on Merchant Marine and Fisheries.
06/04/1981HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (6)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Merchant Marine and Fisheries06/04/1981 Referred to
09/22/1981 Markup by
12/03/1981 Reported by H.Rept 97-354
House Merchant Marine and Fisheries Subcommittee on Fisheries and Wildlife Conservation and the Environment06/11/1981 Referred to
06/11/1981 Hearings by
07/21/1981 Markup by
07/21/1981 Reported by
House Merchant Marine and Fisheries Subcommittee on Panama Canal and Outer Continental Shelf06/30/1981 Referred to
07/21/1981 Markup by
07/21/1981 Reported by
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation12/15/1981 Referred to
06/23/1982 Markup by
06/23/1982 Reported by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (5)

There are 5 summaries for H.R.3816. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (06/23/1982)

(Measure passed Senate, amended)

Amends the Outer Continental Shelf Lands Act Amendments of 1978 to define an "area affected by Outer Continental Shelf activities" as a geographic area where exploration, development, or production activities have been permitted.

Specifies the revenues that shall make up the Fishermen's Contingency Fund. Limits: (1) the total amounts that the Fund may collect relating to Outer Continental Shelf pipeline activities to $2,000,000; (2) administrative and personnel expenses to eight percent of the amount in the Fund; and (3) annual payments for any lease, permit, easement, or right-of-way to $5,000.

Lists activities for which such Fund may be used, including administrative expenses and attorney fees.

Exempts geological and geophysical permits, other than pre-lease exploratory drilling permits, from payments and assessments under this Act.

Restricts the compensation payable to commercial fishermen for specified "resulting economic losses" to 25 percent of such losses.

Revises the eligibility of certain claims for payments from such Fund.

Establishes a presumption that damages to a fishing vessel were caused by activities related to oil and gas exploration, development, or production if a claimant establishes certain facts. Extends the time within which related damage reports must be filed.

Revises claims procedure provisions to: (1) require the Secretary to notify a claimant about an improperly filed claim within 30 days, and gives such claimant 30 days after such notice to refile; (2) require the Secretary to make an initial claim determination within 60 days, and gives the claimant 30 days after such determination to petition for review; (3) give the petitioner 30 days to submit written or oral evidence concerning such review, and requires the Secretary to make a final determination within 60 days of receipt of such review petition; (4) include claim preparation fees within an award; (5) move judicial review jurisdiction for these adjudications from the U.S. circuit courts to the U.S. district courts; and (6) reduce the time for seeking judicial review from 60 to 30 days.

Eliminates the two-year Outer Continental Shelf obstruction survey requirement.

Requires that regulations necessary to implement the provisions of this Act be promulgated within 120 days.

Allows claimants who have filed for compensation before the effective date of this Act to refile.

Amends the Fishery Conservation Zone Transition Act to approve extension of specified governing international fishery agreements due to expire July 1, 1982.