Committees: H.R.3816 — 97th Congress (1981-1982)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Merchant Marine and Fisheries06/04/1981 Referred to
09/22/1981 Markup by
12/03/1981 Reported by H.Rept 97-354
House Merchant Marine and Fisheries Subcommittee on Fisheries and Wildlife Conservation and the Environment06/11/1981 Referred to
06/11/1981 Hearings by
07/21/1981 Markup by
07/21/1981 Reported by
House Merchant Marine and Fisheries Subcommittee on Panama Canal and Outer Continental Shelf06/30/1981 Referred to
07/21/1981 Markup by
07/21/1981 Reported by
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation12/15/1981 Referred to
06/23/1982 Markup by
06/23/1982 Reported by