Committees: H.R.4169 — 97th Congress (1981-1982)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Appropriations01/15/1981 Referred to
07/16/1981 Markup by
07/16/1981 Reported by H.Rept 97-180
House Appropriations Subcommittee on Commerce, Justice, State, and the Judiciary01/15/1981 Referred to
05/07/1981 Hearings by
06/23/1981 Markup by
Senate Appropriations09/10/1981 Referred to
10/28/1981 Markup by
10/30/1981 Reported by S.Rept 97-265
Senate Appropriations Subcommittee on State, Justice, Commerce, the Judiciary09/10/1981 Referred to
09/11/1981 Markup by
09/11/1981 Reported by