Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Howard, James J. [D-NJ-3]* 07/22/1981
Rep. Lujan, Manuel, Jr. [R-NM-1]* 07/22/1981
Rep. Clausen, Don H. [R-CA-2]* 07/22/1981
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-5]* 07/22/1981
Rep. Fuqua, Don [D-FL-2]* 07/22/1981
Rep. Gibbons, Sam [D-FL-7]* 07/22/1981
Rep. Breaux, John B. [D-LA-7]* 07/22/1981
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [D-LA-3] 09/09/1981
Rep. Ireland, Andrew P. [D-FL-8] 09/09/1981
Rep. Sunia, Foto I. F. [D-AS-At Large] 09/09/1981
Rep. Young, Robert A. [D-MO-2] 09/09/1981
Rep. Marriott, David Daniel [R-UT-2] 09/09/1981
Rep. Huckaby, Thomas J. (Jerry) [D-LA-5] 09/09/1981
Rep. Nelson, Bill [D-FL-9] 09/09/1981
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19] 09/09/1981
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-13] 09/09/1981
Rep. Hutto, Earl [D-FL-1] 09/09/1981
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 09/09/1981
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-12] 09/09/1981
Rep. Fascell, Dante B. [D-FL-15] 09/09/1981
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7] 09/09/1981
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-23] 09/23/1981
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 09/23/1981
Rep. Badham, Robert E. [R-CA-40] 09/23/1981
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-21] 09/23/1981
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-29] 09/23/1981
Rep. Martin, James G. [R-NC-9] 09/23/1981
Rep. Rousselot, John H. [R-CA-26] 09/23/1981
Rep. Loeffler, Tom [R-TX-21] 09/23/1981
Rep. Gramm, Phil [D-TX-6] 12/09/1981
Rep. Lott, Trent [R-MS-5] 12/09/1981
Rep. Jones, James R. [D-OK-1] 12/09/1981
Rep. Wright, James C., Jr. [D-TX-12] 12/09/1981
Rep. Hollenbeck, Harold C. [R-NJ-9] 12/09/1981
Rep. Hance, Kent R. [D-TX-19] 12/09/1981
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 12/09/1981
Rep. Napier, John L. [R-SC-6] 12/09/1981
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 12/09/1981
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 12/09/1981
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 12/09/1981
Rep. Crane, Daniel B. [R-IL-22] 12/09/1981
Rep. Leland, Mickey [D-TX-18] 12/09/1981
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7] 12/09/1981
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 12/09/1981
Rep. Alexander, Bill [D-AR-1] 03/24/1982
Rep. Findley, Paul [R-IL-20] 07/20/1982
Rep. Pritchard, Joel [R-WA-1] 07/20/1982
Rep. Hubbard, Carroll, Jr. [D-KY-1] 07/20/1982
Rep. Myers, John T. [R-IN-7] 07/20/1982