Committees: H.R.4281 — 97th Congress (1981-1982)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Science and Technology07/27/1981 Referred to
08/11/1982 Markup by
08/18/1982 Reported by H.Rept 97-761 Part 1
House Science and Technology Subcommittee on Transportation, Aviation and Materials07/30/1981 Referred to
04/22/1982 Hearings by
07/29/1982 Markup by
07/29/1982 Reported by
House Armed Services08/18/1982 Referred to
09/22/1982 Discharged from
House Armed Services Subcommittee on Seapower and Strategic and Critical Materials08/30/1982 Referred to
09/13/1982 Hearings by
09/13/1982 Reported by