Committees: H.R.4326 — 97th Congress (1981-1982)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Small Business07/29/1981 Referred to
10/22/1981 Markup by
11/20/1981 Reported by H.Rept 97-349 Part 1
House Small Business Subcommittee on General Oversight09/11/1981 Referred to
10/07/1981 Markup by
10/07/1981 Reported by
House Armed Services11/20/1981 Referred to
03/11/1982 Markup by
03/16/1982 Reported by H.Rept 97-349 Part 6
House Armed Services Subcommittee on Investigations11/30/1981 Referred to
House Armed Services Subcommittee on Research and Development12/28/1981 Referred to
03/10/1982 Hearings by
03/11/1982 Markup by
03/11/1982 Reported by
House Energy and Commerce11/20/1981 Referred to
02/25/1982 Markup by
03/10/1982 Reported by H.Rept 97-349 Part 2
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health and Environment11/23/1981 Referred to
02/02/1982 Hearings by
02/23/1982 Markup by
02/23/1982 Reported by
House Science and Technology11/20/1981 Referred to
01/28/1982 Hearings by
03/09/1982 Markup by
03/16/1982 Reported by H.Rept 97-349 Part 4
House Veterans' Affairs11/20/1981 Referred to
03/01/1982 Markup by
03/16/1982 Reported by H.Rept 97-349 Part 3
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Hospitals and Health Care01/27/1982 Referred to
01/27/1982 Hearings by
01/27/1982 Markup by
01/27/1982 Reported by
House Intelligence (Permanent Select)03/02/1982 Referred to
03/16/1982 Reported by H.Rept 97-349 Part 7
House Foreign Affairs03/02/1982 Referred to
03/16/1982 Markup by
03/16/1982 Reported by H.Rept 97-349 Part 5