Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Mitchell, Parren J. [D-MD-7]* 11/19/1981
Rep. Smith, Neal Edward [D-IA-4]* 11/19/1981
Rep. Addabbo, Joseph P. [D-NY-7]* 11/19/1981
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20]* 11/19/1981
Rep. Bedell, Berkley W. [D-IA-6]* 11/19/1981
Rep. Richmond, Frederick W. [D-NY-14]* 11/19/1981
Rep. Nowak, Henry [D-NY-37]* 11/19/1981
Rep. Luken, Thomas A. [D-OH-2]* 11/19/1981
Rep. Ireland, Andrew P. [D-FL-8]* 11/19/1981
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 11/19/1981
Rep. Evans, Billy Lee [D-GA-8]* 11/19/1981
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 11/19/1981
Rep. Mazzoli, Romano L. [D-KY-3]* 11/19/1981
Rep. Mavroules, Nicholas [D-MA-6]* 11/19/1981
Rep. Crockett, George W., Jr. [D-MI-13]* 11/19/1981
Rep. Hatcher, Charles [D-GA-2]* 11/19/1981
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3]* 11/19/1981
Rep. Eckart, Dennis E. [D-OH-22]* 11/19/1981
Rep. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND-At Large]* 11/19/1981
Rep. Savage, Gus [D-IL-2]* 11/19/1981
Rep. Roemer, Buddy [D-LA-4]* 11/19/1981
Rep. Fary, John G. [D-IL-5]* 11/19/1981
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10]* 11/19/1981
Rep. Conte, Silvio O. [R-MA-1]* 11/19/1981
Rep. Stanton, J. William [R-OH-11]* 11/19/1981
Rep. Broomfield, William S. [R-MI-19]* 11/19/1981
Rep. Marriott, David Daniel [R-UT-2]* 11/19/1981
Rep. Williams, Lyle [R-OH-19]* 11/19/1981
Rep. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME-2]* 11/19/1981
Rep. Crane, Daniel B. [R-IL-22]* 11/19/1981
Rep. Hiler, John Patrick [R-IN-3]* 11/19/1981
Rep. Staton, David Michael [R-WV-3]* 11/19/1981
Rep. Weber, Vin [R-MN-6]* 11/19/1981
Rep. Daub, Hal [R-NE-2]* 11/19/1981
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 11/19/1981
Rep. Weber, Ed [R-OH-9]* 11/19/1981
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-35]* 11/19/1981
Rep. Molinari, Guy [R-NY-17]* 11/19/1981
Rep. Siljander, Mark D. [R-MI-4]* 11/19/1981
Rep. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI-2]* 11/19/1981
Rep. Atkinson, Eugene V. [D-PA-25]* 11/19/1981
Rep. Barnard, Doug, Jr. [D-GA-10]* 11/19/1981
Rep. Barnes, Michael D. [D-MD-8]* 11/19/1981
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4]* 11/19/1981
Rep. Bonker, Don [D-WA-3]* 11/19/1981
Rep. Bowen, David R. [D-MS-2]* 11/19/1981
Rep. Brown, Clarence, Jr. [R-OH-7]* 11/19/1981
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1]* 11/19/1981
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-23]* 11/19/1981
Rep. Coelho, Anthony Lee [D-CA-15]* 11/19/1981
Rep. Corrada, Baltasar [I-PR-At Large]* 11/19/1981
Rep. D'Amours, Norman E. [D-NH-1]* 11/19/1981
Rep. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD-1]* 11/19/1981
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-28]* 11/19/1981
Rep. Dunn, Jim [R-MI-6]* 11/19/1981
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-15]* 11/19/1981
Rep. Edgar, Robert W. [D-PA-7]* 11/19/1981
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large]* 11/19/1981
Rep. Ferraro, Geraldine A. [D-NY-9]* 11/19/1981
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-25]* 11/19/1981
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1]* 11/19/1981
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-8]* 11/19/1981
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 11/19/1981
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2]* 11/19/1981
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6]* 11/19/1981
Rep. Green, S. William [R-NY-18]* 11/19/1981
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1]* 11/19/1981
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-34]* 11/19/1981
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 11/19/1981
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2]* 11/19/1981
Rep. Glickman, Dan [D-KS-4]* 11/19/1981
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-7]* 11/19/1981
Rep. Kogovsek, Ray [D-CO-3]* 11/19/1981
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11]* 11/19/1981
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1]* 11/19/1981
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-37]* 11/19/1981
Rep. Lowery, Bill [R-CA-41]* 11/19/1981
Rep. Lundine, Stanley N. [D-NY-39]* 11/19/1981
Rep. McHugh, Matthew F. [D-NY-27]* 11/19/1981
Rep. McKinney, Stewart B. [R-CT-4]* 11/19/1981
Rep. Madigan, Edward R. [R-IL-21]* 11/19/1981
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 11/19/1981
Rep. Marks, Marc L. [R-PA-24]* 11/19/1981
Rep. Martin, David O'B. [R-NY-30]* 11/19/1981
Rep. Martin, Lynn M. [R-IL-16]* 11/19/1981
Rep. Mica, Daniel Andrew [D-FL-11]* 11/19/1981
Rep. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD-3]* 11/19/1981
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3]* 11/19/1981
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-22]* 11/19/1981
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5]* 11/19/1981
Rep. Nelligan, James L. [R-PA-11]* 11/19/1981
Rep. Patterson, Jerry M. [D-CA-38]* 11/19/1981
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10]* 11/19/1981
Rep. Pritchard, Joel [R-WA-1]* 11/19/1981
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-4]* 11/19/1981
Rep. Railsback, Thomas F. [R-IL-19]* 11/19/1981
Rep. Rodino, Peter W., Jr. [D-NJ-10]* 11/19/1981
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8]* 11/19/1981
Rep. Roth, Toby [R-WI-8]* 11/19/1981
Rep. Seiberling, John F. [D-OH-14]* 11/19/1981
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-29]* 11/19/1981
Rep. Stangeland, Arlan [R-MN-7]* 11/19/1981
Rep. Sunia, Foto I. F. [D-AS-At Large]* 11/19/1981
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4]* 11/19/1981
Rep. Weaver, James H. [D-OR-4]* 11/19/1981
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2]* 11/19/1981
Rep. Wirth, Timothy [D-CO-2]* 11/19/1981
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3]* 11/19/1981
Rep. Won Pat, Antonio B. [D-GU-At Large]* 11/19/1981
Rep. Wortley, George C. [R-NY-32]* 11/19/1981
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7]* 11/19/1981
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4]* 11/19/1981
Rep. Mitchell, Donald J. [R-NY-31] 11/20/1981
Rep. Dyson, Roy [D-MD-1] 11/20/1981
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-21] 11/20/1981
Rep. Myers, John T. [R-IN-7] 11/20/1981
Rep. Coats, Daniel [R-IN-4] 11/20/1981
Rep. Forsythe, Edwin B. [R-NJ-6] 11/20/1981
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3] 11/20/1981
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-1] 11/20/1981
Rep. Hagedorn, Thomas M. [R-MN-2] 11/20/1981
Rep. McEwen, Bob [R-OH-6] 11/20/1981
Rep. Ottinger, Richard L. [D-NY-24] 11/20/1981
Rep. Gregg, Judd [R-NH-2] 11/20/1981
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-1] 12/09/1981
Rep. Schneider, Claudine [R-RI-2] 12/09/1981
Rep. Simon, Paul [D-IL-24] 12/09/1981
Rep. Boner, William H. [D-TN-5] 12/09/1981
Rep. Winn, Larry, Jr. [R-KS-3] 12/09/1981
Rep. Benjamin, Adam, Jr. [D-IN-1] 12/09/1981
Rep. Biaggi, Mario [D-NY-10] 12/09/1981
Rep. Andrews, Ike [D-NC-4] 12/09/1981
Rep. Bailey, Donald A. [D-PA-21] 12/09/1981
Rep. Brodhead, William [D-MI-17] 12/09/1981
Rep. Roberts, Clint [R-SD-2] 12/09/1981
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-9] 12/10/1981
Rep. Coyne, James K. [R-PA-8] 12/10/1981
Rep. Brinkley, Jack [D-GA-3] 12/10/1981
Rep. Ritter, Don [R-PA-15] 12/10/1981
Rep. Anthony, Beryl, Jr. [D-AR-4] 12/10/1981
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 12/10/1981
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31] 12/10/1981
Rep. Ginn, Bo [D-GA-1] 12/10/1981
Rep. Clausen, Don H. [R-CA-2] 12/14/1981
Rep. Smith, Denny [R-OR-2] 12/14/1981
Rep. Broyhill, James T. [R-NC-10] 12/14/1981
Rep. Erdahl, Arlen [R-MN-1] 12/14/1981
Rep. Downey, Thomas J. [D-NY-2] 12/14/1981
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-22] 12/14/1981
Rep. Corcoran, Tom [R-IL-15] 12/15/1981
Rep. Fascell, Dante B. [D-FL-15] 12/15/1981
Rep. Guarini, Frank J. [D-NJ-14] 12/16/1981
Rep. de la Garza, E. [D-TX-15] 12/16/1981
Rep. Gaydos, Joseph M. [D-PA-20] 12/16/1981
Rep. Albosta, Donald J. [D-MI-10] 12/16/1981
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 12/16/1981
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 01/28/1982
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-27] 01/28/1982
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19] 01/28/1982
Rep. DeNardis, Lawrence J. [R-CT-3] 01/28/1982
Rep. Ratchford, William R. [D-CT-5] 01/28/1982
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-13] 01/28/1982
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 01/28/1982
Rep. Emery, David F. [R-ME-1] 01/28/1982
Rep. Jones, James R. [D-OK-1] 01/28/1982
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 01/28/1982
Rep. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT-At Large] 01/28/1982
Rep. Frenzel, Bill [R-MN-3] 02/08/1982
Rep. Burgener, Clair W. [R-CA-43] 02/08/1982
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 02/08/1982
Rep. Marlenee, Ron [R-MT-2] 02/08/1982
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 02/08/1982
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 02/08/1982
Rep. Lee, Gary A. [R-NY-33] 02/08/1982
Rep. Chisholm, Shirley [D-NY-12] 02/08/1982
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 02/08/1982
Rep. Watkins, Wes [D-OK-3] 02/08/1982
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-19] 02/10/1982
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-16] 02/24/1982
Rep. Jenkins, Edgar L. [D-GA-9] 02/24/1982
Rep. Smith, Joseph F. [D-PA-3] 02/24/1982
Rep. Whittaker, Bob [R-KS-5] 02/24/1982
Rep. Pepper, Claude [D-FL-14] 02/24/1982
Rep. Jeffries, Jim [R-KS-2] 03/03/1982
Rep. Vander Jagt, Guy [R-MI-9] 03/03/1982
Rep. Chappell, Bill, Jr. [D-FL-4] 03/10/1982
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 03/10/1982
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 03/10/1982
Rep. Findley, Paul [R-IL-20] 03/10/1982