Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Social Security Alien and Foreign Resident Limitations Act of 1981

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

A bill to amend title II of the Social Security Act to limit benefits in the case of individuals who are not citizens or nationals of the United States or who are residing abroad.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
09/09/1981Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
09/14/1981Referred to Subcommittee on Social Security.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
09/09/1981Referred to House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/09/1981Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (94)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Barnard, Doug, Jr. [D-GA-10]* 09/21/1981
Rep. Roth, Toby [R-WI-8]* 09/21/1981
Rep. Beard, Robin [R-TN-6]* 09/21/1981
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4]* 09/21/1981
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3]* 09/21/1981
Rep. Carney, William [R-NY-1]* 09/21/1981
Rep. Daniel, Robert W., Jr. [R-VA-4]* 09/21/1981
Rep. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD-1]* 09/21/1981
Rep. Forsythe, Edwin B. [R-NJ-6]* 09/21/1981
Rep. Hall, Sam B., Jr. [D-TX-1]* 09/21/1981
Rep. Hartnett, Thomas F. [R-SC-1]* 09/21/1981
Rep. Holt, Marjorie S. [R-MD-4]* 09/21/1981
Rep. Hopkins, Larry J. [R-KY-6]* 09/21/1981
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 09/21/1981
Rep. LeBoutillier, John [R-NY-6]* 09/21/1981
Rep. Long, Clarence D. [D-MD-2]* 09/21/1981
Rep. Martin, James G. [R-NC-9]* 09/21/1981
Rep. Mottl, Ronald M. [D-OH-23]* 09/21/1981
Rep. Nelligan, James L. [R-PA-11]* 09/21/1981
Rep. Parris, Stanford E. (Stan) [R-VA-8]* 09/21/1981
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 09/21/1981
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10]* 09/21/1981
Rep. Roberts, Clint [R-SD-2]* 09/21/1981
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-29]* 09/21/1981
Rep. Staton, David Michael [R-WV-3]* 09/21/1981
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 09/21/1981
Rep. Trible, Paul S., Jr. [R-VA-1]* 09/21/1981
Rep. Walker, Robert S. [R-PA-16]* 09/21/1981
Rep. Watkins, Wes [D-OK-3]* 09/21/1981
Rep. Weber, Vin [R-MN-6]* 09/21/1981
Rep. Evans, Cooper [R-IA-3]* 09/21/1981
Rep. Collins, James M. [R-TX-3] 10/05/1981
Rep. Dougherty, Charles F. [R-PA-4] 10/05/1981
Rep. Duncan, John J. [R-TN-2] 10/05/1981
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 10/05/1981
Rep. Lott, Trent [R-MS-5] 10/05/1981
Rep. McGrath, Raymond J. [R-NY-5] 10/05/1981
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3] 10/05/1981
Rep. O'Brien, George M. [R-IL-17] 10/05/1981
Rep. Railsback, Thomas F. [R-IL-19] 10/05/1981
Rep. Rudd, Eldon D. [R-AZ-4] 10/05/1981
Rep. Schneider, Claudine [R-RI-2] 10/05/1981
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-12] 10/05/1981
Rep. Snyder, M. G. (Gene) [R-KY-4] 10/05/1981
Rep. Weber, Ed [R-OH-9] 10/05/1981
Rep. Wylie, Chalmers P. [R-OH-15] 10/05/1981
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 10/05/1981
Rep. Hagedorn, Thomas M. [R-MN-2] 10/05/1981
Rep. Bedell, Berkley W. [D-IA-6] 10/22/1981
Rep. Boggs, Corinne C. (Lindy) [D-LA-2] 10/22/1981
Rep. Chappell, Bill, Jr. [D-FL-4] 10/22/1981
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-35] 10/22/1981
Rep. Erdahl, Arlen [R-MN-1] 10/22/1981
Rep. Simon, Paul [D-IL-24] 10/22/1981
Rep. Tauke, Thomas Joseph [R-IA-2] 11/12/1981
Rep. Davis, Robert W. [R-MI-11] 11/12/1981
Rep. Miller, Clarence E. [R-OH-10] 11/20/1981
Rep. Coyne, James K. [R-PA-8] 11/20/1981
Rep. Napier, John L. [R-SC-6] 11/20/1981
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 12/09/1981
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-42] 12/16/1981
Rep. Biaggi, Mario [D-NY-10] 02/02/1982
Rep. Broyhill, James T. [R-NC-10] 02/02/1982
Rep. Smith, Joseph F. [D-PA-3] 02/02/1982
Rep. Butler, M. Caldwell [R-VA-6] 02/02/1982
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-10] 02/02/1982
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 02/02/1982
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 02/02/1982
Rep. Atkinson, Eugene V. [D-PA-25] 02/02/1982
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 02/02/1982
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 02/02/1982
Rep. Sawyer, Harold S. [R-MI-5] 02/02/1982
Rep. English, Glenn [D-OK-6] 02/02/1982
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1] 02/02/1982
Rep. Daniel, W. C. (Dan) [D-VA-5] 02/02/1982
Rep. Hiler, John Patrick [R-IN-3] 02/02/1982
Rep. Frenzel, Bill [R-MN-3] 02/02/1982
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-6] 02/02/1982
Rep. Shumway, Norman D. [R-CA-14] 02/09/1982
Rep. Rousselot, John H. [R-CA-26] 02/09/1982
Rep. McDonald, Lawrence P. [D-GA-7] 02/09/1982
Rep. Yatron, Gus [D-PA-6] 02/09/1982
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 02/09/1982
Rep. Evans, Thomas B., Jr. [R-DE-At Large] 02/22/1982
Rep. Taylor, G. [R-MO-7] 02/22/1982
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-27] 02/22/1982
Rep. Rose, Charlie [D-NC-7] 02/22/1982
Rep. Lowery, Bill [R-CA-41] 02/22/1982
Rep. Robinson, J. Kenneth [R-VA-7] 03/02/1982
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 05/03/1982
Rep. Goldwater, Barry, Jr. [R-CA-20] 05/04/1982
Rep. Patman, William N. [D-TX-14] 05/18/1982
Rep. Nichols, Bill [D-AL-3] 05/20/1982
Rep. Smith, Albert L., Jr. [R-AL-6] 09/15/1982

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means09/09/1981 Referred to
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Social Security09/14/1981 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4449. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (09/09/1981)

Social Security Alien and Foreign Resident Limitations Act of 1981 - Amends title II (Old Age, Survivors and Disability Insurance) of the Social Security Act to prohibit entitlement to title II benefits in the case of an individual who is not a U.S. citizen or national and whose entitlement is based upon the wages and self-employment income of a resident of a foreign country who is entitled to old-age or disability benefits if such individual does not bear a spousal, filial, parental, divorced, or surviving relationship to such resident as of the date such resident reaches age 57.

Prohibits entitlement to title II benefits in the case of an individual who is not a U.S. citizen or national on the basis of such individual's own wages and self-employment income. Entitles a non-U.S. citizen or national to a single lump-sum benefit on the basis of such individual's wages and self-employment income if such individual is lawfully admitted to the United States for permanent residence or employment purposes or such individual's status is changed to permit such individual to work in the United States.

Prohibits entitlement to title II benefits in the case of a non-U.S. citizen or national whose entitlement is based upon the wages and self-employment income of a non-U.S. citizen or national who is not a permanent resident of the United States or who has not been admitted to the United States for employment purposes. Prohibits entitlement to title II benefits in the case of a U.S. citizen or national whose entitlement is based upon the wages and self-employment income of a non-U.S. citizen or national.