Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Barnes, Michael D. [D-MD-8]* 12/09/1981
Rep. Bedell, Berkley W. [D-IA-6]* 12/09/1981
Rep. Bonker, Don [D-WA-3]* 12/09/1981
Rep. Brodhead, William [D-MI-17]* 12/09/1981
Rep. Conte, Silvio O. [R-MA-1]* 12/09/1981
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-1]* 12/09/1981
Rep. Courter, Jim [R-NJ-13]* 12/09/1981
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-8]* 12/09/1981
Rep. Downey, Thomas J. [D-NY-2]* 12/09/1981
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-15]* 12/09/1981
Rep. Dyson, Roy [D-MD-1]* 12/09/1981
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-10]* 12/09/1981
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large]* 12/09/1981
Rep. Fenwick, Millicent H. [R-NJ-5]* 12/09/1981
Rep. Howard, James J. [D-NJ-3]* 12/09/1981
Rep. Harkin, Tom [D-IA-5]* 12/09/1981
Rep. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT-At Large]* 12/09/1981
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-7]* 12/09/1981
Rep. Lowry, Mike [D-WA-7]* 12/09/1981
Rep. Mitchell, Parren J. [D-MD-7]* 12/09/1981
Rep. Ottinger, Richard L. [D-NY-24]* 12/09/1981
Rep. Patterson, Jerry M. [D-CA-38]* 12/09/1981
Rep. Pepper, Claude [D-FL-14]* 12/09/1981
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8]* 12/09/1981
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 12/09/1981
Rep. Tauke, Thomas Joseph [R-IA-2]* 12/09/1981
Rep. Washington, Harold [D-IL-1]* 12/09/1981
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5]* 12/09/1981
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-25]* 12/09/1981
Rep. Seiberling, John F. [D-OH-14]* 12/09/1981
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-12] 03/11/1982
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3] 03/11/1982
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-23] 03/11/1982
Rep. Coats, Daniel [R-IN-4] 03/11/1982
Rep. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD-1] 03/11/1982
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-28] 03/11/1982
Rep. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND-At Large] 03/11/1982
Rep. Edgar, Robert W. [D-PA-7] 03/11/1982
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31] 03/11/1982
Rep. Fary, John G. [D-IL-5] 03/11/1982
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 03/11/1982
Rep. Findley, Paul [R-IL-20] 03/11/1982
Rep. Forsythe, Edwin B. [R-NJ-6] 03/11/1982
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/11/1982
Rep. Frenzel, Bill [R-MN-3] 03/11/1982
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 03/11/1982
Rep. Hubbard, Carroll, Jr. [D-KY-1] 03/11/1982
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 03/11/1982
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-11] 03/11/1982
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-13] 03/11/1982
Rep. Leland, Mickey [D-TX-18] 03/11/1982
Rep. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD-3] 03/11/1982
Rep. Nowak, Henry [D-NY-37] 03/11/1982
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 03/11/1982
Rep. Railsback, Thomas F. [R-IL-19] 03/11/1982
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-19] 03/11/1982
Rep. Richmond, Frederick W. [D-NY-14] 03/11/1982
Rep. Rosenthal, Benjamin S. [D-NY-8] 03/11/1982
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-12] 03/11/1982
Rep. Walgren, Doug [D-PA-18] 03/11/1982
Rep. Weaver, James H. [D-OR-4] 03/11/1982
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3] 03/11/1982
Rep. Yatron, Gus [D-PA-6] 03/11/1982
Rep. Aspin, Les [D-WI-1] 04/26/1982
Rep. AuCoin, Les [D-OR-1] 04/26/1982
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 04/26/1982
Rep. Bowen, David R. [D-MS-2] 04/26/1982
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 04/26/1982
Rep. Coyne, James K. [R-PA-8] 04/26/1982
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-27] 04/26/1982
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 04/26/1982
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 04/26/1982
Rep. Hollenbeck, Harold C. [R-NJ-9] 04/26/1982
Rep. Kastenmeier, Robert W. [D-WI-2] 04/26/1982
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 04/26/1982
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11] 04/26/1982
Rep. Lundine, Stanley N. [D-NY-39] 04/26/1982
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 04/26/1982
Rep. McHugh, Matthew F. [D-NY-27] 04/26/1982
Rep. Minish, Joseph G. [D-NJ-11] 04/26/1982
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-16] 04/26/1982
Rep. Sharp, Philip R. [D-IN-10] 04/26/1982
Rep. Simon, Paul [D-IL-24] 04/26/1982
Rep. Staton, David Michael [R-WV-3] 04/26/1982
Rep. Whitehurst, G. William [R-VA-2] 04/26/1982
Rep. Blanchard, James [D-MI-18] 06/22/1982
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 06/22/1982
Rep. Gray, William H., III [D-PA-2] 06/22/1982
Rep. Dougherty, Charles F. [R-PA-4] 06/22/1982
Rep. Guarini, Frank J. [D-NJ-14] 06/22/1982
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-34] 06/22/1982
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3] 06/22/1982
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 06/22/1982
Rep. Panetta, Leon [D-CA-16] 06/22/1982
Rep. Peyser, Peter A. [R-NY-23] 06/22/1982
Rep. Pritchard, Joel [R-WA-1] 06/22/1982
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-9] 06/22/1982
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 06/22/1982
Rep. Hertel, Dennis M. [D-MI-14] 07/13/1982
Rep. Luken, Thomas A. [D-OH-2] 07/13/1982
Rep. Moffett, Toby [D-CT-6] 07/13/1982
Rep. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME-2] 07/13/1982
Rep. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI-2] 09/15/1982
Rep. Alexander, Bill [D-AR-1] 09/15/1982
Rep. Andrews, Ike [D-NC-4] 09/15/1982
Rep. Boland, Edward P. [D-MA-2] 09/15/1982
Rep. Burton, Phillip [D-CA-6] 09/15/1982
Rep. Corrada, Baltasar [I-PR-At Large] 09/15/1982
Rep. Crockett, George W., Jr. [D-MI-13] 09/15/1982
Rep. Daub, Hal [R-NE-2] 09/15/1982
Rep. DeNardis, Lawrence J. [R-CT-3] 09/15/1982
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-35] 09/15/1982
Rep. Emery, David F. [R-ME-1] 09/15/1982
Rep. Erdahl, Arlen [R-MN-1] 09/15/1982
Rep. Ertel, Allen E. [D-PA-17] 09/15/1982
Rep. Florio, James J. [D-NJ-1] 09/15/1982
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 09/15/1982
Rep. Garcia, Robert [D-NY-21] 09/15/1982
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 09/15/1982
Rep. Long, Clarence D. [D-MD-2] 09/15/1982
Rep. McGrath, Raymond J. [R-NY-5] 09/15/1982
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 09/15/1982
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13] 09/15/1982
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 09/15/1982
Rep. Oakar, Mary Rose [D-OH-20] 09/15/1982
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 09/15/1982
Rep. Pickle, J. J. [D-TX-10] 09/15/1982
Rep. Roybal, Edward R. [D-CA-25] 09/15/1982
Rep. Sawyer, Harold S. [R-MI-5] 09/15/1982
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-11] 09/15/1982
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1] 09/15/1982
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 09/15/1982
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-24] 09/15/1982
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-20] 09/15/1982
Rep. Wirth, Timothy [D-CO-2] 09/15/1982
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 09/15/1982
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 09/15/1982
Rep. McKinney, Stewart B. [R-CT-4] 09/15/1982
Rep. Chisholm, Shirley [D-NY-12] 09/30/1982
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 09/30/1982
Rep. Corcoran, Tom [R-IL-15] 09/30/1982
Rep. Fithian, Floyd J. [D-IN-2] 09/30/1982
Rep. Levitas, Elliott H. [D-GA-4] 09/30/1982
Rep. Pease, Donald J. [D-OH-13] 09/30/1982
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 09/30/1982
Rep. Ratchford, William R. [D-CT-5] 10/01/1982
Rep. Addabbo, Joseph P. [D-NY-7] 12/07/1982
Rep. Beilenson, Anthony C. [D-CA-23] 12/07/1982
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36] 12/07/1982
Rep. Ferraro, Geraldine A. [D-NY-9] 12/07/1982
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-8] 12/07/1982
Rep. Green, S. William [R-NY-18] 12/07/1982
Rep. Hance, Kent R. [D-TX-19] 12/07/1982
Rep. Heckler, Margaret M. [R-MA-10] 12/07/1982
Rep. LeBoutillier, John [R-NY-6] 12/07/1982
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-30] 12/07/1982
Rep. Schneider, Claudine [R-RI-2] 12/07/1982
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-21] 12/07/1982
Rep. Udall, Morris K. [D-AZ-2] 12/07/1982
Rep. Walker, Robert S. [R-PA-16] 12/07/1982
Rep. Zeferetti, Leo C. [D-NY-15] 12/07/1982
Rep. Gore, Albert, Jr. [D-TN-4] 12/16/1982
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-22] 12/16/1982
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 12/16/1982