Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Debt Collection Act of 1981

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

A bill to increase the efficiency of Government-wide efforts to collect debts owed the United States and to provide additional procedures for the collection of debts owed the United States.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
09/29/1981Introduced in House

All Actions (6)

Date
07/15/1982Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Judiciary Subcommittee on Administrative Law and Governmental Relations
07/14/1982Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Judiciary Subcommittee on Administrative Law and Governmental Relations
06/10/1982Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Judiciary Subcommittee on Administrative Law and Governmental Relations
10/01/1981Referred to Subcommittee on Administrative Law and Governmental Relations.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
09/29/1981Referred to House Committee on The Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/29/1981Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-22]* 09/29/1981
Rep. McClory, Robert [R-IL-13]* 09/29/1981

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary09/29/1981 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Administrative Law and Governmental Relations10/01/1981 Referred to
07/15/1982 Hearings by

No related bill information was received for H.R.4614.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4614. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (09/29/1981)

Debt Collection Act of 1981 - Makes the murder or manslaughter of a Federal debt collector a Federal offense.

Allows the Government to collect claims by administrative offset beyond the six year statute of limitations on actions brought by the Government for money damages.

Amends the Federal Claims Collection Act of 1966 to direct each agency to charge a minimum annual rate of interest on outstanding debts and to assess a penalty charge and handling costs on delinquent claims, except where another statute, statutorily mandated regulation, loan agreement, or contract either prohibits or explicitly fixes interest or penalty charges.

Declares that service of legal process brought for the collection of United States claims shall be accomplished in accordance with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure or as directed by the court.

Authorizes the head of an agency to enter into a contract with any person for the collection of claims owed the United States. Requires any such contract to include provisions subjecting the contractor to the Privacy Act of 1974 and other applicable Federal and State laws governing debt collection.