Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Price, Melvin [D-IL-23]* 11/16/1981
Rep. Stratton, Samuel S. [D-NY-28]* 11/16/1981
Rep. White, Richard C. [D-TX-16]* 11/16/1981
Rep. Nichols, Bill [D-AL-3]* 11/16/1981
Rep. Brinkley, Jack [D-GA-3]* 11/16/1981
Rep. Mollohan, Robert H. [D-WV-1]* 11/16/1981
Rep. Daniel, W. C. (Dan) [D-VA-5]* 11/16/1981
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3]* 11/16/1981
Rep. Aspin, Les [D-WI-1]* 11/16/1981
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1]* 11/16/1981
Rep. Kazen, Abraham, Jr. [D-TX-23]* 11/16/1981
Rep. Won Pat, Antonio B. [D-GU-At Large]* 11/16/1981
Rep. McDonald, Lawrence P. [D-GA-7]* 11/16/1981
Rep. Stump, Bob [D-AZ-3]* 11/16/1981
Rep. Mavroules, Nicholas [D-MA-6]* 11/16/1981
Rep. Hutto, Earl [D-FL-1]* 11/16/1981
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 11/16/1981
Rep. Leath, Marvin [D-TX-11]* 11/16/1981
Rep. McCurdy, Dave [D-OK-4]* 11/16/1981
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1]* 11/16/1981
Rep. Dyson, Roy [D-MD-1]* 11/16/1981
Rep. Hertel, Dennis M. [D-MI-14]* 11/16/1981
Rep. Smith, Joseph F. [D-PA-3]* 11/16/1981
Rep. Whitehurst, G. William [R-VA-2]* 11/16/1981
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2]* 11/16/1981
Rep. Beard, Robin [R-TN-6]* 11/16/1981
Rep. Mitchell, Donald J. [R-NY-31]* 11/16/1981
Rep. Holt, Marjorie S. [R-MD-4]* 11/16/1981
Rep. Daniel, Robert W., Jr. [R-VA-4]* 11/16/1981
Rep. Hillis, Elwood H. [R-IN-5]* 11/16/1981
Rep. Emery, David F. [R-ME-1]* 11/16/1981
Rep. Trible, Paul S., Jr. [R-VA-1]* 11/16/1981
Rep. Dougherty, Charles F. [R-PA-4]* 11/16/1981
Rep. Courter, Jim [R-NJ-13]* 11/16/1981
Rep. Hopkins, Larry J. [R-KY-6]* 11/16/1981
Rep. Davis, Robert W. [R-MI-11]* 11/16/1981
Rep. Kramer, Ken [R-CO-5]* 11/16/1981
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-42]* 11/16/1981
Rep. Nelligan, James L. [R-PA-11]* 11/16/1981
Rep. Hartnett, Thomas F. [R-SC-1]* 11/16/1981
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3]* 11/16/1981
Rep. Morrison, Sid [R-WA-4]* 11/16/1981
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10]* 11/16/1981
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7]* 11/16/1981
Rep. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD-1]* 11/16/1981
Rep. Deckard, Joel [R-IN-8]* 11/16/1981
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 11/16/1981
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-15]* 11/16/1981
Rep. Flippo, Ronnie G. [D-AL-5]* 11/16/1981
Rep. English, Glenn [D-OK-6]* 11/16/1981
Rep. Evans, Cooper [R-IA-3]* 11/16/1981
Rep. Gaydos, Joseph M. [D-PA-20]* 11/16/1981
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2]* 11/16/1981
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3]* 11/16/1981
Rep. Clausen, Don H. [R-CA-2]* 11/16/1981
Rep. Pritchard, Joel [R-WA-1]* 11/16/1981
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8]* 11/16/1981
Rep. Mottl, Ronald M. [D-OH-23]* 11/16/1981
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-22]* 11/16/1981
Rep. Myers, John T. [R-IN-7]* 11/16/1981
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 11/16/1981
Rep. Smith, Albert L., Jr. [R-AL-6]* 11/16/1981
Rep. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME-2]* 11/16/1981
Rep. Wampler, William C. [R-VA-9]* 11/16/1981
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9]* 11/16/1981
Rep. Addabbo, Joseph P. [D-NY-7] 11/20/1981
Rep. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI-2] 11/20/1981
Rep. Bafalis, L. A. (Skip) [R-FL-10] 11/20/1981
Rep. Barnard, Doug, Jr. [D-GA-10] 11/20/1981
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 11/20/1981
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4] 11/20/1981
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-36] 11/20/1981
Rep. Broyhill, James T. [R-NC-10] 11/20/1981
Rep. Burgener, Clair W. [R-CA-43] 11/20/1981
Rep. Barnes, Michael D. [D-MD-8] 11/20/1981
Rep. Campbell, Carroll A., Jr. [R-SC-4] 11/20/1981
Rep. Corrada, Baltasar [I-PR-At Large] 11/20/1981
Rep. D'Amours, Norman E. [D-NH-1] 11/20/1981
Rep. Dannemeyer, William E. [R-CA-39] 11/20/1981
Rep. de la Garza, E. [D-TX-15] 11/20/1981
Rep. Derwinski, Edward J. [R-IL-4] 11/20/1981
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-27] 11/20/1981
Rep. Erdahl, Arlen [R-MN-1] 11/20/1981
Rep. Evans, Billy Lee [D-GA-8] 11/20/1981
Rep. Fary, John G. [D-IL-5] 11/20/1981
Rep. Fascell, Dante B. [D-FL-15] 11/20/1981
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large] 11/20/1981
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 11/20/1981
Rep. Fenwick, Millicent H. [R-NJ-5] 11/20/1981
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 11/20/1981
Rep. Fithian, Floyd J. [D-IN-2] 11/20/1981
Rep. Ford, William D. [D-MI-15] 11/20/1981
Rep. Forsythe, Edwin B. [R-NJ-6] 11/20/1981
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 11/20/1981
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-26] 11/20/1981
Rep. Ginn, Bo [D-GA-1] 11/20/1981
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 11/20/1981
Rep. Gore, Albert, Jr. [D-TN-4] 11/20/1981
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-36] 11/20/1981
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19] 11/20/1981
Rep. LeBoutillier, John [R-NY-6] 11/20/1981
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-13] 11/20/1981
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 11/20/1981
Rep. Lowery, Bill [R-CA-41] 11/20/1981
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-34] 11/20/1981
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10] 11/20/1981
Rep. Martin, Lynn M. [R-IL-16] 11/20/1981
Rep. Miller, Clarence E. [R-OH-10] 11/20/1981
Rep. Minish, Joseph G. [D-NJ-11] 11/20/1981
Rep. Molinari, Guy [R-NY-17] 11/20/1981
Rep. Napier, John L. [R-SC-6] 11/20/1981
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 11/20/1981
Rep. O'Brien, George M. [R-IL-17] 11/20/1981
Rep. Panetta, Leon [D-CA-16] 11/20/1981
Rep. Patman, William N. [D-TX-14] 11/20/1981
Rep. Pepper, Claude [D-FL-14] 11/20/1981
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 11/20/1981
Rep. Peyser, Peter A. [R-NY-23] 11/20/1981
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-4] 11/20/1981
Rep. Reuss, Henry S. [D-WI-5] 11/20/1981
Rep. Ritter, Don [R-PA-15] 11/20/1981
Rep. Rodino, Peter W., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 11/20/1981
Rep. Simon, Paul [D-IL-24] 11/20/1981
Rep. Sunia, Foto I. F. [D-AS-At Large] 11/20/1981
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 11/20/1981
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 11/20/1981
Rep. Wortley, George C. [R-NY-32] 11/20/1981
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-6] 11/20/1981
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 11/20/1981
Rep. Zablocki, Clement J. [D-WI-4] 11/20/1981
Rep. Edwards, Mickey [R-OK-5] 11/20/1981
Rep. Staton, David Michael [R-WV-3] 11/20/1981
Rep. Carman, Gregory W. [R-NY-3] 12/07/1981
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 12/07/1981
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 12/07/1981
Rep. Daub, Hal [R-NE-2] 12/07/1981
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-25] 12/07/1981
Rep. Goldwater, Barry, Jr. [R-CA-20] 12/07/1981
Rep. Hughes, William J. [D-NJ-2] 12/07/1981
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11] 12/07/1981
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-37] 12/07/1981
Rep. Mica, Daniel Andrew [D-FL-11] 12/07/1981
Rep. Robinson, J. Kenneth [R-VA-7] 12/07/1981
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 12/07/1981
Rep. Biaggi, Mario [D-NY-10] 02/09/1982
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-29] 02/09/1982
Rep. Udall, Morris K. [D-AZ-2] 02/09/1982
Rep. Lowry, Mike [D-WA-7] 02/09/1982
Rep. Atkinson, Eugene V. [D-PA-25] 02/10/1982

Show cosponsors who withdrew