Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

A bill to amend title 5, United States Code, to provide training opportunities for employees under the Office of the Architect of the Capitol and the Botanic Garden, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (9)

Date Actions Overview
10/15/1982Became Public Law No: 97-346.
10/15/1982Signed by President.
10/13/1982Presented to President.
10/01/1982Resolving differences -- House actions: House Agreed to Senate Amendments by Unanimous Consent.
09/29/1982Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with amendments by Voice Vote.
09/29/1982Senate Committee on Governmental Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.
05/11/1982Passed/agreed to in House: Passed House by Voice Vote.
03/25/1982Reported to House by House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service. Report No: 97-473.
12/09/1981Introduced in House

All Actions (21)

Date Chamber All Actions
10/15/1982Became Public Law No: 97-346.
10/15/1982Signed by President.
10/13/1982HousePresented to President.
10/12/1982SenateMeasure Signed in Senate.
10/01/1982HouseHouse Agreed to Senate Amendments by Unanimous Consent.
09/29/1982SenatePassed Senate with amendments by Voice Vote.
09/29/1982SenateConsidered by Senate.
09/29/1982SenateSenate Committee on Governmental Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.
09/29/1982SenateS.Up.Amdt.1344 Amendment SU 1344 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
09/29/1982SenateS.Up.Amdt.1344 Proposed by Senator Baker for Senator Stevens. To authorize OPM to detail senior executives subject to RIF to agencies with vacant positions, and to rechannel certain government contributions to the Federal Employee Health Benefits Program into the contingency reserves of the health carriers.
05/20/1982SenateReferred to Subcommittee on Civil Service and General Services.
Action By: Committee on Governmental Affairs
05/12/1982SenateReceived in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Governmental Affairs.
05/11/1982HousePassed House by Voice Vote.
05/11/1982HouseCalled up by House Under Suspension of Rules.
03/25/1982HousePlaced on Union Calendar No: 285.
03/25/1982HouseReported to House by House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service. Report No: 97-473.
03/10/1982HouseOrdered to be Reported.
Action By: Committee on Post Office and Civil Service
03/10/1982HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Post Office and Civil Service
12/23/1981HouseExecutive Comment Requested from GAO, OMB.
12/09/1981HouseReferred to House Committee on Post Office and Civil Service.
12/09/1981HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1]* 12/09/1981

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Post Office and Civil Service12/09/1981 Referred to
03/10/1982 Markup by
03/25/1982 Reported by H.Rept 97-473
Senate Governmental Affairs05/12/1982 Referred to
09/29/1982 Discharged from
Senate Governmental Affairs Subcommittee on Civil Service, Post Office, and General Services05/20/1982 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.5145.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.5145. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (09/29/1982)

(Measure passed Senate, amended)

Authorizes the Architect of the Capitol to provide training, according to specified provisions of Federal law, for employees of the Office of the Architect of the Capitol and the Botanic Garden and other employees under the Architect's supervision.

Amends the Omnibus Budget Reconciliation Act of 1982 to make certain technical amendments concerning: (1) civil service retirement credit for military service; (2) interest on civil service retirement deposits or contributions; (3) entitlement to a lump-sum credit for or a refund of retirement funds; (4) use of the Civil Service Retirement and Disability Fund to pay the administrative expenses of withholding taxes from civil service annuities; (5) the offsetting of civilian pay by the amount of cost of living increases in military retired or retainer pay; (6) disability retirement eligibility, especially for National Guard technicians; (7) retirement contributions by employed annuitants; (8) the reduction of annuities based in part on military service by a portion of the amount of Social Security survivor benefits; (9) computation of the hourly pay rate of Federal employees; and (10) travel expenses for employees stationed in Alaska or Hawaii.

Requires the Office of Personnel Management (OPM) to determine the difference between the amount of the Government contribution to the Federal Employee Health Benefits Program for 1983 and the amount such contribution would have been if the two employee organizations included in the 1981 calculations were included in the 1983 calculations. Requires the Government to pay the difference into the contingency reserves of all health benefits plans for 1983 in proportion to the number of enrollees in each plan.

Entitles any career appointee of the Senior Executive Service (SES) who is scheduled to be removed due to a reduction in force to: (1) be detailed for 60 days by the OPM to a vacant SES position in any agency for which the OPM deems the individual to be qualified; (2) be placed in such position after such 60 days unless the agency determines that the individual is not qualified; and (3) appeal such a determination to the Merit Systems Position Board.