Committees: H.R.5519 — 97th Congress (1981-1982)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Foreign Affairs02/10/1982 Referred to
House Foreign Affairs Subcommittee on International Economic Policy and Trade02/17/1982 Referred to
09/21/1982 Hearings by
House Energy and Commerce02/10/1982 Referred to
06/24/1982 Markup by
08/19/1982 Reported by H.Rept 97-766 Part 1
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Commerce, Transportation and Tourism02/22/1982 Referred to
03/11/1982 Hearings by
06/16/1982 Markup by
06/16/1982 Reported by
House Ways and Means02/10/1982 Referred to
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Trade02/17/1982 Referred to