Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

A bill to amend title 38, United States Code, to extend the delimiting period within which a Vietnam era veteran may use educational assistance under chapter 34 of that title upon discharge or release from active duty from the present 10 years to 20 years, but not later than December 31, 1999.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
03/09/1982Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
03/09/1982Referred to House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/09/1982Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (62)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bailey, Donald A. [D-PA-21]* 03/09/1982
Rep. Corrada, Baltasar [I-PR-At Large] 03/25/1982
Rep. Fauntroy, Walter E. [D-DC-At Large] 03/25/1982
Rep. Mitchell, Parren J. [D-MD-7] 03/25/1982
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-19] 03/25/1982
Rep. Richmond, Frederick W. [D-NY-14] 03/25/1982
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 03/25/1982
Rep. Ford, William D. [D-MI-15] 03/25/1982
Rep. Sunia, Foto I. F. [D-AS-At Large] 03/25/1982
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 03/25/1982
Rep. Hertel, Dennis M. [D-MI-14] 03/25/1982
Rep. Lowry, Mike [D-WA-7] 03/25/1982
Rep. Forsythe, Edwin B. [R-NJ-6] 03/25/1982
Rep. Duncan, John J. [R-TN-2] 03/25/1982
Rep. Dougherty, Charles F. [R-PA-4] 03/25/1982
Rep. Ratchford, William R. [D-CT-5] 04/01/1982
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-13] 04/01/1982
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 04/01/1982
Rep. Washington, Harold [D-IL-1] 04/01/1982
Rep. Long, Clarence D. [D-MD-2] 04/01/1982
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 04/01/1982
Rep. Smith, Joseph F. [D-PA-3] 04/01/1982
Rep. Barnes, Michael D. [D-MD-8] 04/01/1982
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-7] 04/01/1982
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/01/1982
Rep. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD-3] 04/01/1982
Rep. Fary, John G. [D-IL-5] 04/01/1982
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 04/01/1982
Rep. Emery, David F. [R-ME-1] 04/01/1982
Rep. Gray, William H., III [D-PA-2] 04/06/1982
Rep. Panetta, Leon [D-CA-16] 04/06/1982
Rep. Wyden, Ron [D-OR-3] 04/06/1982
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3] 04/06/1982
Rep. Rosenthal, Benjamin S. [D-NY-8] 04/06/1982
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-16] 04/20/1982
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-1] 04/20/1982
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3] 04/20/1982
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-12] 04/20/1982
Rep. Albosta, Donald J. [D-MI-10] 04/20/1982
Rep. Crockett, George W., Jr. [D-MI-13] 04/20/1982
Rep. Traxler, Bob [D-MI-8] 04/20/1982
Rep. Brodhead, William [D-MI-17] 04/20/1982
Rep. Dunn, Jim [R-MI-6] 04/29/1982
Rep. Daub, Hal [R-NE-2] 04/29/1982
Rep. Corcoran, Tom [R-IL-15] 04/29/1982
Rep. Bedell, Berkley W. [D-IA-6] 04/29/1982
Rep. Kogovsek, Ray [D-CO-3] 04/29/1982
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13] 04/29/1982
Rep. Bingham, Jonathan B. [D-NY-22] 04/29/1982
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 04/29/1982
Rep. Simon, Paul [D-IL-24] 05/06/1982
Rep. Leland, Mickey [D-TX-18] 05/06/1982
Rep. Shamansky, Bob [D-OH-12] 05/06/1982
Rep. Ottinger, Richard L. [D-NY-24] 05/06/1982
Rep. D'Amours, Norman E. [D-NH-1] 05/06/1982
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-15] 05/27/1982
Rep. Beard, Robin [R-TN-6] 05/27/1982
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-21] 05/27/1982
Rep. Heckler, Margaret M. [R-MA-10] 05/27/1982
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-11] 06/08/1982
Rep. Collins, Cardiss [D-IL-7] 06/16/1982
Rep. Williams, Lyle [R-OH-19] 07/14/1982

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs03/09/1982 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.5762.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.5762. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/09/1982)

Extends from ten to 20 years the delimiting period within which a Vietnam-era veteran may use educational assistance benefits.