Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Voting Rights for the Handicapped and the Elderly Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

A bill to provide that registration and polling places for Federal elections be accessible to handicapped and elderly individuals, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
04/01/1982Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date All Actions
04/01/1982Referred to House Committee on House Administration.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/01/1982Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (59)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Walgren, Doug [D-PA-18]* 04/01/1982
Rep. Barnes, Michael D. [D-MD-8] 04/29/1982
Rep. Bedell, Berkley W. [D-IA-6] 04/29/1982
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-23] 04/29/1982
Rep. Courter, Jim [R-NJ-13] 04/29/1982
Rep. Crockett, George W., Jr. [D-MI-13] 04/29/1982
Rep. Dunn, Jim [R-MI-6] 04/29/1982
Rep. Edgar, Robert W. [D-PA-7] 04/29/1982
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 04/29/1982
Rep. Lehman, William [D-FL-13] 04/29/1982
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10] 04/29/1982
Rep. Mitchell, Parren J. [D-MD-7] 04/29/1982
Rep. Mottl, Ronald M. [D-OH-23] 04/29/1982
Rep. Murphy, Austin J. [D-PA-22] 04/29/1982
Rep. Ottinger, Richard L. [D-NY-24] 04/29/1982
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 04/29/1982
Rep. Roemer, Buddy [D-LA-4] 04/29/1982
Rep. Santini, James D. [D-NV-98] 04/29/1982
Rep. Schroeder, Patricia [D-CO-1] 04/29/1982
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-16] 04/29/1982
Rep. Smith, Joseph F. [D-PA-3] 04/29/1982
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-9] 04/29/1982
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-21] 04/29/1982
Rep. Weiss, Ted [D-NY-20] 04/29/1982
Rep. Wirth, Timothy [D-CO-2] 04/29/1982
Rep. DeNardis, Lawrence J. [R-CT-3] 04/29/1982
Rep. Richmond, Frederick W. [D-NY-14] 04/29/1982
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 05/13/1982
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-10] 05/13/1982
Rep. Washington, Harold [D-IL-1] 05/13/1982
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 05/13/1982
Rep. Lowery, Bill [R-CA-41] 05/13/1982
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 05/19/1982
Rep. Heckler, Margaret M. [R-MA-10] 05/19/1982
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 05/19/1982
Rep. Long, Clarence D. [D-MD-2] 05/19/1982
Rep. Howard, James J. [D-NJ-3] 05/19/1982
Rep. Bingham, Jonathan B. [D-NY-22] 05/27/1982
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-19] 05/27/1982
Rep. Weaver, James H. [D-OR-4] 05/27/1982
Rep. Gray, William H., III [D-PA-2] 06/22/1982
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 06/22/1982
Rep. Beard, Robin [R-TN-6] 06/22/1982
Rep. Gore, Albert, Jr. [D-TN-4] 06/22/1982
Rep. Nelligan, James L. [R-PA-11] 06/22/1982
Rep. Pepper, Claude [D-FL-14] 06/22/1982
Rep. Ferraro, Geraldine A. [D-NY-9] 06/22/1982
Rep. Evans, Billy Lee [D-GA-8] 07/26/1982
Rep. Dwyer, Bernard J. [D-NJ-15] 07/26/1982
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-26] 07/26/1982
Rep. Addabbo, Joseph P. [D-NY-7] 07/26/1982
Rep. Chisholm, Shirley [D-NY-12] 07/26/1982
Rep. Schneider, Claudine [R-RI-2] 07/26/1982
Rep. Bailey, Donald A. [D-PA-21] 07/26/1982
Rep. Mineta, Norman Y. [D-CA-13] 09/28/1982
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-11] 09/28/1982
Rep. Fary, John G. [D-IL-5] 09/28/1982
Rep. Dowdy, Wayne [D-MS-4] 09/28/1982
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 09/28/1982

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Administration04/01/1982 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (10)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.6036. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/01/1982)

Voting Rights for the Handicapped and the Elderly Act - Directs the Attorney General to promulgate guidelines to assure that registration and polling place facilities used for Federal elections are readily accessible to handicapped and elderly individuals. Sets forth minimum requirements for these guidelines.

Requires States to make available registration and voting aids for handicapped and elderly individuals in Federal elections.

Authorizes the Attorney General and aggrieved persons to bring actions in Federal court to enforce this Act.