Full texts of bills are not available on Congress.gov for bills prior to 1989 (101st Congress).

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Health Planning Block Grant Act of 1982

Short Titles as Reported to House

Health Planning Block Grant Act of 1982

Short Titles as Introduced

Health Planning Block Grant Act of 1982

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

A bill to amend the Public Health Service Act to replace title XV of such Act with a block grant to States for health planning.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
09/24/1982Passed/agreed to in House: Passed House (Amended) by Yea-Nay Vote: 302 - 14 (Record Vote No: 371).
08/20/1982Reported to House (Amended) by House Committee on Energy and Commerce. Report No: 97-784.
04/27/1982Introduced in House

All Actions (18)

Date Chamber All Actions
10/08/1982SenateCommittee on Labor and Human Resources requested executive comment from Health and Human Services Department; GAO; OMB.
09/28/1982SenateReceived in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Labor and Human Resources.
09/24/1982HousePassed House (Amended) by Yea-Nay Vote: 302 - 14 (Record Vote No: 371).
09/24/1982HouseHouse Agreed to Amendments Adopted by the Committee of the Whole.
09/22/1982HouseConsidered by House Unfinished Business.
09/22/1982HouseRule Passed House.
09/21/1982HouseRules Committee Resolution H.Res.594 Reported to House.
09/21/1982HouseCommittee on Rules Granted an Open Rule with One Hour of Debate, Making in Order the Text of H.R.7040 as an Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute.
08/20/1982HousePlaced on Union Calendar No: 478.
08/20/1982HouseReported to House (Amended) by House Committee on Energy and Commerce. Report No: 97-784.
05/20/1982HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended).
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
05/20/1982HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
04/30/1982HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health and Environment
04/30/1982HouseReferred to Subcommittee on Health and the Environment.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
04/30/1982HouseHearings Held by Subcommittee on Health and the Environment Prior to Introduction (Mar 22, 1982).
04/27/1982HouseFor Previous Action See H.R.6339.
04/27/1982HouseReferred to House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
04/27/1982HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Findley, Paul [R-IL-20]* 05/24/1982
Rep. Chappie, Eugene A. [R-CA-1] 06/17/1982

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce04/27/1982 Referred to
04/30/1982 Hearings by
05/20/1982 Markup by
08/20/1982 Reported by H.Rept 97-784
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health and Environment04/30/1982 Referred to
04/30/1982 Hearings by
Senate Labor and Human Resources09/28/1982 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (10)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.6173. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (09/24/1982)

(Measure passed House, amended, roll call #371 (302-14) (Inserted text of H.R. 7040))

Health Planning Block Grant Act of 1982 - Replaces title XV (National Health Planning and Development) of the Public Health Service Act with State health planning block grants. Authorizes appropriations for FY 1983 and 1984.

Sets forth a schedule for the issuance of regulations, the approval or disapproval of State applications, and the obligation of funds. Denies funding to any State which does not revise its certificate of need laws to accord with this Act.

Bases State allotments on population. Provides that any unallocated funds shall be returned to the Treasury.

Provides with regard to State allotments that: (1) unobligated funds shall be available to the State for the next fiscal year; and (2) payments may be reduced by the value of furnished supplies or certain travel costs.

Requires States to use their allotments to develop a certificate of need program and a State health plan.

Prohibits a State from receiving funds unless its application has been approved by the Secretary of Health and Human Services. Requires such application to include a report on intended expenditures. Requires States to prepare activity reports and to audit expenditures at least every two years.

Prohibits discrimination on the basis of age, handicap, sex, religion, race, color, or national origin in the administration of any programs or activities funded under this Act. Prescribes compliance and enforcement measures.

Requires States to determine that there is a need for a new institutional health service and capital expenditure before offering such services or obligating funds. Exempts health maintenance organization (HMO) services and inpatient health care facilities controlled by an HMO or group of HMOs from certificate of need requirements, upon approval of application for such exemption. Permits the approval of a certificate of need for an HMO in certain circumstances, especially for the acquisition of major medical equipment.

Requires that certificates of need for capital expenditures state a maximum spendable amount.

Authorizes the State agency to withdraw after a hearing on a certificate of need for applicant noncompliance.

Requires the State agency to review a certificate of need application on the basis of the State Health Plan.

Sets forth procedural requirements respecting a State certificate of need program.

Prescribes the general contents of a State health plan. Requires a biennial revision of such plan.

Directs the Secretary of Health and Human Services to make grants to States for the regional health planning agencies. Sets forth a formula for the allocation of grant funds. Conditions such grants on the designation of intrastate or interstate health planning areas established according to specified criteria. Requires a regional health planning agency for each such area. Limits the sources of non-Federal contributions to such agencies. Describes the functions of such agencies.

Directs the Secretary by grants or contracts to assist public or private nonprofit entities in meeting the operating costs of a center for multidisciplinary health planning methods development and technical assistance.

Repeals the health planning block grant program effective September 30 of the third complete successive fiscal year after enactment of this Act. States that such repeal will not affect any suits or other proceedings begun before such effective date.