Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Michel, Robert H. [R-IL-18]* 05/19/1982
Rep. Lott, Trent [R-MS-5]* 05/19/1982
Rep. Conte, Silvio O. [R-MA-1]* 05/19/1982
Rep. Albosta, Donald J. [D-MI-10]* 05/19/1982
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 05/19/1982
Rep. Pursell, Carl D. [R-MI-2]* 05/19/1982
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-4]* 05/19/1982
Rep. McClory, Robert [R-IL-13]* 05/19/1982
Rep. McEwen, Bob [R-OH-6]* 05/19/1982
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19]* 05/19/1982
Rep. Gunderson, Steve [R-WI-3]* 05/19/1982
Rep. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID-1]* 05/19/1982
Rep. Emery, David F. [R-ME-1]* 05/19/1982
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2]* 05/19/1982
Rep. Daub, Hal [R-NE-2]* 05/19/1982
Rep. Johnston, Eugene (Gene) [R-NC-6]* 05/19/1982
Rep. Napier, John L. [R-SC-6]* 05/19/1982
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 05/19/1982
Rep. Roberts, Clint [R-SD-2]* 05/19/1982
Rep. Forsythe, Edwin B. [R-NJ-6]* 05/19/1982
Rep. Whitehurst, G. William [R-VA-2]* 05/19/1982
Rep. Dunn, Jim [R-MI-6]* 05/19/1982
Rep. Brodhead, William [D-MI-17]* 05/19/1982
Rep. Kindness, Thomas N. [R-OH-8]* 05/19/1982
Rep. Wright, James C., Jr. [D-TX-12] 05/20/1982
Rep. Annunzio, Frank [D-IL-11] 05/20/1982
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7] 05/20/1982
Rep. Broomfield, William S. [R-MI-19] 05/20/1982
Rep. Carney, William [R-NY-1] 05/20/1982
Rep. Clausen, Don H. [R-CA-2] 05/20/1982
Rep. Coats, Daniel [R-IN-4] 05/20/1982
Rep. Dannemeyer, William E. [R-CA-39] 05/20/1982
Rep. Davis, Robert W. [R-MI-11] 05/20/1982
Rep. Dornan, Robert K. [R-CA-27] 05/20/1982
Rep. Hammerschmidt, John P. [R-AR-3] 05/20/1982
Rep. Hiler, John Patrick [R-IN-3] 05/20/1982
Rep. Holt, Marjorie S. [R-MD-4] 05/20/1982
Rep. Latta, Delbert L. [R-OH-5] 05/20/1982
Rep. Lee, Gary A. [R-NY-33] 05/20/1982
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10] 05/20/1982
Rep. Molinari, Guy [R-NY-17] 05/20/1982
Rep. Mottl, Ronald M. [D-OH-23] 05/20/1982
Rep. Moorhead, Carlos J. [R-CA-22] 05/20/1982
Rep. Myers, John T. [R-IN-7] 05/20/1982
Rep. Sawyer, Harold S. [R-MI-5] 05/20/1982
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 05/20/1982
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 05/20/1982
Rep. Taylor, G. [R-MO-7] 05/20/1982
Rep. Roberts, Pat [R-KS-1] 05/20/1982
Rep. Walker, Robert S. [R-PA-16] 05/20/1982
Rep. Weber, Ed [R-OH-9] 05/21/1982
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 05/21/1982
Rep. Frenzel, Bill [R-MN-3] 05/21/1982
Rep. LeBoutillier, John [R-NY-6] 05/21/1982
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 05/21/1982
Rep. Jeffries, Jim [R-KS-2] 05/21/1982
Rep. Stangeland, Arlan [R-MN-7] 05/21/1982
Rep. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL-7] 05/21/1982
Rep. Marlenee, Ron [R-MT-2] 05/21/1982
Rep. Dyson, Roy [D-MD-1] 05/21/1982
Rep. Tauke, Thomas Joseph [R-IA-2] 05/21/1982
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 05/21/1982
Rep. Hartnett, Thomas F. [R-SC-1] 05/21/1982
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-29] 05/21/1982
Rep. Evans, Thomas B., Jr. [R-DE-At Large] 05/21/1982
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-42] 05/21/1982
Rep. Atkinson, Eugene V. [D-PA-25] 05/21/1982
Rep. Coyne, James K. [R-PA-8] 05/21/1982
Rep. McGrath, Raymond J. [R-NY-5] 05/21/1982
Rep. Hansen, George V. [R-ID-2] 05/21/1982
Rep. Martin, David O'B. [R-NY-30] 05/21/1982
Rep. Brown, Hank [R-CO-4] 05/21/1982
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 05/21/1982
Rep. Parris, Stanford E. (Stan) [R-VA-8] 05/21/1982
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 05/21/1982
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-3] 05/21/1982
Rep. Edwards, Mickey [R-OK-5] 05/24/1982
Rep. Benedict, Cleve [R-WV-2] 05/24/1982
Rep. Lujan, Manuel, Jr. [R-NM-1] 05/24/1982
Rep. Wortley, George C. [R-NY-32] 05/24/1982
Rep. Weber, Vin [R-MN-6] 05/24/1982
Rep. Winn, Larry, Jr. [R-KS-3] 05/24/1982
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-6] 05/24/1982
Rep. Smith, Albert L., Jr. [R-AL-6] 05/24/1982
Rep. Mitchell, Donald J. [R-NY-31] 05/24/1982
Rep. Fish, Hamilton, Jr. [R-NY-25] 05/24/1982
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-34] 05/24/1982
Rep. Sunia, Foto I. F. [D-AS-At Large] 05/24/1982
Rep. Broyhill, James T. [R-NC-10] 05/24/1982
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 05/24/1982
Rep. Wampler, William C. [R-VA-9] 05/24/1982
Rep. Coughlin, Lawrence [R-PA-13] 05/24/1982
Rep. Rousselot, John H. [R-CA-26] 05/24/1982
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-26] 05/24/1982
Rep. Whittaker, Bob [R-KS-5] 05/24/1982
Rep. O'Brien, George M. [R-IL-17] 05/24/1982
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 06/02/1982
Rep. Trible, Paul S., Jr. [R-VA-1] 06/02/1982
Rep. Bafalis, L. A. (Skip) [R-FL-10] 06/02/1982
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 06/02/1982
Rep. Gregg, Judd [R-NH-2] 06/02/1982
Rep. Grisham, Wayne R. [R-CA-33] 06/02/1982
Rep. Richmond, Frederick W. [D-NY-14] 06/02/1982
Rep. Burgener, Clair W. [R-CA-43] 06/02/1982
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-5] 06/02/1982
Rep. Gray, William H., III [D-PA-2] 06/02/1982
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4] 06/23/1982
Rep. Daniel, W. C. (Dan) [D-VA-5] 06/23/1982
Rep. Ertel, Allen E. [D-PA-17] 06/23/1982
Rep. Fenwick, Millicent H. [R-NJ-5] 06/23/1982
Rep. Garcia, Robert [D-NY-21] 06/23/1982
Rep. Hagedorn, Thomas M. [R-MN-2] 06/23/1982
Rep. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT-At Large] 06/23/1982
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-37] 06/23/1982
Rep. Ritter, Don [R-PA-15] 06/23/1982
Rep. Campbell, Carroll A., Jr. [R-SC-4] 06/23/1982
Rep. Beard, Robin [R-TN-6] 06/23/1982
Rep. Morrison, Sid [R-WA-4] 06/23/1982
Rep. Martin, Lynn M. [R-IL-16] 06/23/1982
Rep. Roe, Robert A. [D-NJ-8] 06/23/1982
Rep. Carman, Gregory W. [R-NY-3] 07/21/1982
Rep. Butler, M. Caldwell [R-VA-6] 07/21/1982
Rep. Edgar, Robert W. [D-PA-7] 07/21/1982
Rep. Wolpe, Howard E. [D-MI-3] 07/21/1982
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-16] 07/21/1982
Rep. Vander Jagt, Guy [R-MI-9] 07/21/1982
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 07/21/1982
Rep. Oakar, Mary Rose [D-OH-20] 07/21/1982
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 07/21/1982
Rep. Erdahl, Arlen [R-MN-1] 07/21/1982
Rep. Crockett, George W., Jr. [D-MI-13] 07/21/1982
Rep. Chappell, Bill, Jr. [D-FL-4] 07/21/1982
Rep. Blanchard, James [D-MI-18] 09/20/1982
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-12] 09/20/1982
Rep. Chisholm, Shirley [D-NY-12] 09/20/1982
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-1] 09/20/1982
Rep. Fithian, Floyd J. [D-IN-2] 09/20/1982
Rep. Ford, William D. [D-MI-15] 09/20/1982
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-7] 09/20/1982
Rep. Leland, Mickey [D-TX-18] 09/20/1982
Rep. Smith, Virginia [R-NE-3] 09/20/1982
Rep. Traxler, Bob [D-MI-8] 09/20/1982
Rep. Simon, Paul [D-IL-24] 09/20/1982
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-36] 09/20/1982

Show cosponsors who withdrew