Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Montgomery, G. V. (Sonny) [D-MS-3]* 05/11/1982
Rep. Hammerschmidt, John P. [R-AR-3]* 05/11/1982
Rep. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD-1] 05/19/1982
Rep. Roberts, Clint [R-SD-2] 05/25/1982
Rep. Byron, Beverly B. [D-MD-6] 05/25/1982
Rep. Derrick, Butler C. [D-SC-3] 06/03/1982
Rep. Bafalis, L. A. (Skip) [R-FL-10] 06/03/1982
Rep. Moore, W. Henson [R-LA-6] 06/03/1982
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-6] 06/03/1982
Rep. Trible, Paul S., Jr. [R-VA-1] 06/03/1982
Rep. Quillen, James H. (Jimmy) [R-TN-1] 06/03/1982
Rep. Ginn, Bo [D-GA-1] 06/03/1982
Rep. Rhodes, John J. [R-AZ-1] 06/03/1982
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-4] 06/03/1982
Rep. Flippo, Ronnie G. [D-AL-5] 06/03/1982
Rep. Mollohan, Robert H. [D-WV-1] 06/03/1982
Rep. Bevill, Tom [D-AL-4] 06/03/1982
Rep. Nichols, Bill [D-AL-3] 06/03/1982
Rep. Fuqua, Don [D-FL-2] 06/09/1982
Rep. Beard, Robin [R-TN-6] 06/09/1982
Rep. Boland, Edward P. [D-MA-2] 06/09/1982
Rep. Weaver, James H. [D-OR-4] 06/09/1982
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-3] 06/09/1982
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 06/09/1982
Rep. Mazzoli, Romano L. [D-KY-3] 06/09/1982
Rep. Benedict, Cleve [R-WV-2] 06/09/1982
Rep. Duncan, John J. [R-TN-2] 06/09/1982
Rep. Loeffler, Tom [R-TX-21] 06/09/1982
Rep. Snyder, M. G. (Gene) [R-KY-4] 06/09/1982
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/09/1982
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 06/09/1982
Rep. Fascell, Dante B. [D-FL-15] 06/09/1982
Rep. Brinkley, Jack [D-GA-3] 06/09/1982
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20] 06/09/1982
Rep. Ireland, Andrew P. [D-FL-8] 06/09/1982
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/09/1982
Rep. Collins, James M. [R-TX-3] 06/17/1982
Rep. Smith, Denny [R-OR-2] 06/17/1982
Rep. Anthony, Beryl, Jr. [D-AR-4] 06/17/1982
Rep. Hatcher, Charles [D-GA-2] 06/17/1982
Rep. McEwen, Bob [R-OH-6] 06/17/1982
Rep. Gore, Albert, Jr. [D-TN-4] 06/17/1982
Rep. Boggs, Corinne C. (Lindy) [D-LA-2] 06/17/1982
Rep. Boner, William H. [D-TN-5] 06/17/1982
Rep. Patman, William N. [D-TX-14] 06/17/1982
Rep. Williams, Pat [D-MT-1] 06/17/1982
Rep. Hagedorn, Thomas M. [R-MN-2] 06/17/1982
Rep. Davis, Robert W. [R-MI-11] 06/17/1982
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 06/17/1982
Rep. Dunn, Jim [R-MI-6] 06/17/1982
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 06/17/1982
Rep. Hance, Kent R. [D-TX-19] 06/17/1982
Rep. Robinson, J. Kenneth [R-VA-7] 06/17/1982
Rep. Frenzel, Bill [R-MN-3] 06/24/1982
Rep. Bailey, Wendell [R-MO-8] 06/24/1982
Rep. Kemp, Jack [R-NY-38] 06/24/1982
Rep. Horton, Frank J. [R-NY-34] 06/24/1982
Rep. Emerson, Bill [R-MO-10] 06/24/1982
Rep. Ertel, Allen E. [D-PA-17] 06/24/1982
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7] 06/24/1982
Rep. Huckaby, Thomas J. (Jerry) [D-LA-5] 06/24/1982
Rep. Bowen, David R. [D-MS-2] 06/24/1982
Rep. Hartnett, Thomas F. [R-SC-1] 06/24/1982
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-29] 07/22/1982
Rep. Stangeland, Arlan [R-MN-7] 07/22/1982
Rep. Wampler, William C. [R-VA-9] 07/22/1982
Rep. Stratton, Samuel S. [D-NY-28] 07/22/1982
Rep. Won Pat, Antonio B. [D-GU-At Large] 07/22/1982
Rep. Barnard, Doug, Jr. [D-GA-10] 07/22/1982
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-5] 07/22/1982
Rep. Dickinson, William L. [R-AL-2] 07/22/1982
Rep. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL-7] 07/22/1982
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 07/22/1982
Rep. Shamansky, Bob [D-OH-12] 07/22/1982
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 07/22/1982
Rep. Roemer, Buddy [D-LA-4] 07/22/1982
Rep. Hightower, Jack E. [D-TX-13] 07/22/1982
Rep. Breaux, John B. [D-LA-7] 07/22/1982
Rep. Lujan, Manuel, Jr. [R-NM-1] 07/22/1982
Rep. Alexander, Bill [D-AR-1] 07/22/1982
Rep. Jones, Walter B. [D-NC-1] 07/22/1982
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 07/22/1982
Rep. McDonald, Lawrence P. [D-GA-7] 07/22/1982
Rep. Levitas, Elliott H. [D-GA-4] 07/22/1982
Rep. Edgar, Robert W. [D-PA-7] 07/22/1982
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-22] 07/22/1982
Rep. Udall, Morris K. [D-AZ-2] 07/22/1982
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [D-LA-3] 07/22/1982
Rep. Evans, Billy Lee [D-GA-8] 07/22/1982
Rep. Edwards, Jack [R-AL-1] 07/22/1982
Rep. Conte, Silvio O. [R-MA-1] 07/22/1982
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-26] 07/22/1982
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 07/22/1982
Rep. Downey, Thomas J. [D-NY-2] 07/22/1982
Rep. Walker, Robert S. [R-PA-16] 07/22/1982
Rep. Bailey, Donald A. [D-PA-21] 07/22/1982
Rep. Whitley, Charles O., Sr. [D-NC-3] 07/22/1982
Rep. Bethune, Ed [R-AR-2] 07/22/1982
Rep. Long, Gillis W. [D-LA-8] 07/22/1982
Rep. Daniel, W. C. (Dan) [D-VA-5] 08/02/1982
Rep. Staton, David Michael [R-WV-3] 08/02/1982
Rep. Lowry, Mike [D-WA-7] 08/02/1982
Rep. Yatron, Gus [D-PA-6] 08/02/1982
Rep. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT-At Large] 08/02/1982
Rep. Sawyer, Harold S. [R-MI-5] 08/02/1982
Rep. Martin, David O'B. [R-NY-30] 08/02/1982
Rep. Pepper, Claude [D-FL-14] 08/02/1982
Rep. Watkins, Wes [D-OK-3] 08/02/1982
Rep. Clinger, William F., Jr. [R-PA-23] 08/02/1982
Rep. McGrath, Raymond J. [R-NY-5] 08/02/1982
Rep. Nelligan, James L. [R-PA-11] 08/16/1982
Rep. Kazen, Abraham, Jr. [D-TX-23] 08/16/1982
Rep. Neal, Stephen L. [D-NC-5] 08/16/1982
Rep. de la Garza, E. [D-TX-15] 08/16/1982
Rep. Edwards, Mickey [R-OK-5] 08/16/1982
Rep. Addabbo, Joseph P. [D-NY-7] 08/16/1982
Rep. Mitchell, Donald J. [R-NY-31] 08/16/1982
Rep. LeBoutillier, John [R-NY-6] 08/16/1982
Rep. Fithian, Floyd J. [D-IN-2] 08/16/1982
Rep. Carney, William [R-NY-1] 08/16/1982
Rep. Richmond, Frederick W. [D-NY-14] 08/16/1982
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 08/16/1982
Rep. Hansen, George V. [R-ID-2] 08/16/1982
Rep. Lott, Trent [R-MS-5] 08/16/1982
Rep. Stump, Bob [D-AZ-3] 08/16/1982
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-36] 08/16/1982
Rep. Peyser, Peter A. [R-NY-23] 08/16/1982
Rep. Zeferetti, Leo C. [D-NY-15] 08/16/1982
Rep. Oakar, Mary Rose [D-OH-20] 08/16/1982
Rep. Applegate, Douglas [D-OH-18] 08/16/1982
Rep. Hutto, Earl [D-FL-1] 08/16/1982
Rep. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME-2] 08/19/1982
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-3] 08/19/1982
Rep. Molinari, Guy [R-NY-17] 08/19/1982
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-19] 08/19/1982
Rep. Dymally, Mervyn M. [D-CA-31] 08/19/1982
Rep. Pickle, J. J. [D-TX-10] 08/19/1982
Rep. Rudd, Eldon D. [R-AZ-4] 08/19/1982
Rep. McHugh, Matthew F. [D-NY-27] 08/19/1982
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 08/19/1982
Rep. Schneider, Claudine [R-RI-2] 08/19/1982
Rep. St Germain, Fernand J. [D-RI-1] 08/19/1982
Rep. Coats, Daniel [R-IN-4] 08/19/1982
Rep. O'Brien, George M. [R-IL-17] 09/09/1982
Rep. Lagomarsino, Robert J. [R-CA-19] 09/09/1982
Rep. White, Richard C. [D-TX-16] 09/09/1982
Rep. Barnes, Michael D. [D-MD-8] 09/09/1982
Rep. Studds, Gerry E. [D-MA-12] 09/09/1982
Rep. Erdahl, Arlen [R-MN-1] 09/09/1982
Rep. Fields, Jack [R-TX-8] 09/09/1982
Rep. McCurdy, Dave [D-OK-4] 09/09/1982
Rep. Wilson, Charles [D-TX-2] 09/09/1982
Rep. Atkinson, Eugene V. [D-PA-25] 09/09/1982
Rep. Vander Jagt, Guy [R-MI-9] 09/09/1982
Rep. Biaggi, Mario [D-NY-10] 09/09/1982
Rep. Bennett, Charles E. [D-FL-3] 09/09/1982
Rep. Santini, James D. [D-NV-98] 09/09/1982
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10] 09/09/1982
Rep. Dyson, Roy [D-MD-1] 09/09/1982
Rep. Gramm, Phil [D-TX-6] 09/09/1982
Rep. Brooks, Jack B. [D-TX-9] 09/09/1982
Rep. Broomfield, William S. [R-MI-19] 09/23/1982
Rep. Parris, Stanford E. (Stan) [R-VA-8] 09/23/1982
Rep. Bingham, Jonathan B. [D-NY-22] 09/23/1982
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-4] 09/23/1982
Rep. Dougherty, Charles F. [R-PA-4] 09/23/1982
Rep. Marlenee, Ron [R-MT-2] 09/23/1982
Rep. Taylor, G. [R-MO-7] 09/23/1982
Rep. Leland, Mickey [D-TX-18] 09/23/1982
Rep. Panetta, Leon [D-CA-16] 09/23/1982
Rep. Mattox, James A. [D-TX-5] 09/23/1982
Rep. Jacobs, Andrew, Jr. [D-IN-11] 09/28/1982
Rep. Coyne, James K. [R-PA-8] 12/02/1982
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3] 12/02/1982
Rep. Whitehurst, G. William [R-VA-2] 12/02/1982
Rep. Scheuer, James H. [D-NY-11] 12/02/1982
Rep. Butler, M. Caldwell [R-VA-6] 12/02/1982
Rep. Edwards, Don [D-CA-10] 12/02/1982
Rep. Lloyd, Marilyn [D-TN-3] 12/02/1982
Rep. Crane, Daniel B. [R-IL-22] 12/02/1982
Rep. Jones, Ed [D-TN-7] 12/02/1982
Rep. Holt, Marjorie S. [R-MD-4] 12/02/1982
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 12/02/1982
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-28] 12/10/1982
Rep. Long, Clarence D. [D-MD-2] 12/10/1982
Rep. Anderson, Glenn M. [D-CA-32] 12/10/1982
Rep. de Lugo, Ron [D-VI-At Large] 12/10/1982
Rep. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND-At Large] 12/10/1982
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-18] 12/10/1982
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-11] 12/10/1982
Rep. Ford, Harold E. [D-TN-8] 12/10/1982